|
21.05.2015 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.10.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.11.2010 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2010 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
13.10.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2009 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
45 |