EP2258397 - POLYMER CONJUGATE OF PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2017/36] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 11-2, Fujimi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Masayuki c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Pharmaceuticals Research Laboratories 31-12, Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 02 /
SENO, Chieko c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Pharmaceuticals Research Laboratories 31-12, Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Masayuki c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Pharmaceuticals Research Laboratories 31-12, Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
SENO, Chieko c/o NIPPON KAYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA Pharmaceuticals Research Laboratories 31-12, Shimo 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wablat Lange Karthaus Anwaltssozietät Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/49] | Wablat Lange Karthaus Anwaltssozietät Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09722008.1 | 17.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009JP55115 | Priority number, date | JP20080069067 | 18.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008069067 | [2010/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009116509 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2258397 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2258397 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/60, A61K47/64, A61K31/352, A61K31/405, A61K31/407, A61K31/704, A61K38/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, C08G69/44, C08G69/48, C08G69/10, C08G69/40 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K31/197 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/645 (EP,KR,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (KR);
C08G69/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | A61K47/48, A61K31/352, A61K31/405, A61K31/407, A61K31/704, A61K38/00, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, C08G69/44, C08G69/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2010/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYMERKONJUGAT AUS EINEM PHYSIOLOGISCH AKTIVEN STOFF | [2010/49] | English: | POLYMER CONJUGATE OF PHYSIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE SUBSTANCE | [2010/49] | French: | CONJUGUÉ DE POLYMÈRE ET DE SUBSTANCE PHYSIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIVE | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2010 | Translation filed | 17.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2009 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | ES | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | IE | 17.03.2018 | LU | 17.03.2018 | MT | 17.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.03.2009 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
MT | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
MT | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
MT | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
IE | 17.03.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
LU | 17.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
ES | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9930727 (ENZON INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO02065988 (ENZON INC [US]); | [YD]EP1580216 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | International search | [Y]JPS61243026 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED [CS], et al); | [Y]JP2000516948 ; | [Y]JP2005508832 ; | [Y]WO2005066214 (SEIKAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007080898 (MEDGEL CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2008010463 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al); | Examination | EP2042195 | EP1401473 | by applicant | JPH05955 | JP2694923B | JP2001131066 | JP2002508400 | JP3268913B | WO2004039869 | JP2004532289 |