EP2268150 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MICROWAVE TREATMENT OF GRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Skåne-Möllan Ab Box 65 260 22 Tagarp / SE | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERSSON, Sten Söderåsvägen 10 S-260 23 Kågeröd / SE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Malin Awapatent AB Järnvägsgatan 10 A 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [2012/40] |
Former [2011/01] | Larsson, Malin Awapatent AB Järnvägsgatan 10 A S-251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 09722291.3 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009SE00144 | Priority number, date | SE20080000653 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: SE 0800653 | [2011/01] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009116923 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268150 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268150 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80, A23L3/01, A23L1/025, A23B9/04 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A23B9/04 (EP);
A23L3/01 (EP);
A23L5/34 (EP);
H05B6/80 (EP);
H05B2206/045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | A23B9/04, A23L1/025, A23L3/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE MIKROWELLENBEHANDLUNG VON GETREIDE | [2011/01] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MICROWAVE TREATMENT OF GRAIN | [2011/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT PAR MICRO-ONDES DE GRAINES | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 22.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 03.10.2012 | BE | 03.10.2012 | CY | 03.10.2012 | CZ | 03.10.2012 | DK | 03.10.2012 | EE | 03.10.2012 | FI | 03.10.2012 | HR | 03.10.2012 | IT | 03.10.2012 | LT | 03.10.2012 | LV | 03.10.2012 | MK | 03.10.2012 | MT | 03.10.2012 | NL | 03.10.2012 | PL | 03.10.2012 | RO | 03.10.2012 | SE | 03.10.2012 | SI | 03.10.2012 | SK | 03.10.2012 | TR | 03.10.2012 | BG | 03.01.2013 | NO | 03.01.2013 | GR | 04.01.2013 | ES | 14.01.2013 | IS | 03.02.2013 | PT | 04.02.2013 | GB | 18.03.2013 | IE | 18.03.2013 | LU | 18.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MK | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
TR | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
MT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CY | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
IT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
RO | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
EE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
SK | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
DK | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
BG | 03.01.2013 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 03.10.2012 | |
BE | 03.10.2012 | ||
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
PT | 04.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 03.10.2012 | |
FI | 03.10.2012 | ||
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
GR | 04.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
HR | 03.10.2012 | ||
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
LV | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
PL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 03.10.2012 | |
LT | 03.10.2012 | ||
NL | 03.10.2012 | ||
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
ES | 14.01.2013 | ||
IS | 03.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SE | 03.10.2012 | ||
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 03.10.2012 | |
SI | 03.10.2012 | ||
NO | 03.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 03.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CA1061867 (CANADA MAJESTY IN RIGHT OF) [X] 1-4,9,12,15 * figures 2,3 * * page 1, lines 1-6, * * page 2, line 29 - page 4, line 30 * * pages 6,7 * * claims * [A] 5,7,8; | [Y]US4332091 (BENSUSSAN ANDRE ET AL) [Y] 1-12 * figure 5 * * column 1, lines 26-41 * * column 3, lines 13-51 *; | [Y]JPH06165660 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 10] - [0013] - [0017] - [0019] - [0022] , [0024] *; | [A]JPH03118881 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]WO0154519 (SKAANE MOELLAN AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US5834744 (RISMAN PER O [SE]); | [Y]JPH06165660 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]CA975434 (PATELHOLD PATENTVERWERTUNG); | [Y]ES2164014 (UNIV VALENCIA POLITECNICA [ES]); | [A]US4631380 (TRAN VAN N [AU]); | [A]RU2143794 ; | [A]US3711709 (RUDOLF W); | [A]US3590202 (DAY JOHN D A, et al) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 48, Database accession no. 2000-530887, XP003025512 & RU2143794 C1 20000110 (PLAZMA-T CO LTD) | by applicant | CA1061867 | US4332091 | JPH06165660 | ES2164014 |