EP2265298 - BIODEGRADABLE CARBON DIAZENIUMDIOLATE BASED NITRIC OXIDE DONATING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular Inc. IP Legal Department 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2010/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Peiwen 366 Breeden Street Santa Rosa California 95409 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Mingfei 5763 Owl Hill Avenue Santa Rosa California 95409 / US | 03 /
UDIPI, Kishore 3575 Alkirst Court Santa Rosa California 95403 / US | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstrasse 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09722429.9 | 05.02.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009US33165 | Priority number, date | US20080049618 | 17.03.2008 Original published format: US 49618 | [2010/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009117182 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2265298 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/06, A61L31/14, A61L31/16, A61L31/10 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE STICKOXID-ABGEBENDE POLYMERE AUF BASIS VON KOHLENSTOFFDIAZENIUMDIOLAT | [2010/52] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE CARBON DIAZENIUMDIOLATE BASED NITRIC OXIDE DONATING POLYMERS | [2010/52] | French: | POLYMÈRES DONNEURS D OXYDE NITRIQUE À BASE DE DIAZÉNIUMDIOLATE DE CARBONE BIODÉGRADABLE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 22.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2006008529 (MEYERHOFF MARK E [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,13 * paragraph [0030]; claims 1,9-11 *; | [I]WO2007053292 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * | by applicant | US2006008529 | US2004037836 |