EP2260175 - WELL PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I-TEC AS Kanalveien 8 4052 Røyneberg / NO | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÆKKE, Kristoffer Kvernhusveien 1B N-4025 Stavanger / NO | [2011/09] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
BRÆKKE, Kristoffer Taugata 23B N-4014 Stavanger / NO | Representative(s) | Tafjord, Harald Bryn Aarflot AS Stortingsgata 8 0161 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Tafjord, Harald Bryn Aarflot AS P.O. Box 449 Sentrum 0104 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2010/50] | Tafjord, Harald Bryn Aarflot AS Patent P.O. Box 449 Sentrum 0104 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 09722981.9 | 19.03.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009NO00105 | Priority number, date | NO20080001406 | 19.03.2008 Original published format: NO 20081406 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009116875 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260175 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2260175 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.09.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/129, E21B34/12, F16K5/06, E21B23/06 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
E21B23/06 (EP,US);
E21B33/1294 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | E21B33/129, E21B34/12, F16K5/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/16] |
Former [2010/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHSTOPFEN | [2010/50] | English: | WELL PLUG | [2010/50] | French: | BOUCHON DE PUITS | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 07.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2009 | AT | 19.04.2017 | CY | 19.04.2017 | CZ | 19.04.2017 | EE | 19.04.2017 | ES | 19.04.2017 | FI | 19.04.2017 | HR | 19.04.2017 | IT | 19.04.2017 | LT | 19.04.2017 | LV | 19.04.2017 | MK | 19.04.2017 | PL | 19.04.2017 | PT | 19.04.2017 | RO | 19.04.2017 | SE | 19.04.2017 | SI | 19.04.2017 | SK | 19.04.2017 | TR | 19.04.2017 | BG | 19.07.2017 | NO | 19.07.2017 | GR | 20.07.2017 | IS | 19.08.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 19.03.2009 | |
AT | 19.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
PT | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
TR | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SI | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
CZ | 19.04.2017 | ||
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
RO | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
SK | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
EE | 19.04.2017 | ||
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
LV | 19.04.2017 | ||
PL | 19.04.2017 | ||
SE | 19.04.2017 | ||
BG | 19.07.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 19.04.2017 | |
ES | 19.04.2017 | ||
FI | 19.04.2017 | ||
HR | 19.04.2017 | ||
LT | 19.04.2017 | ||
NO | 19.07.2017 | ||
GR | 20.07.2017 | ||
IS | 19.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3398928 (FREDD JOHN V); | [X]US4421171 (HAYNES ANDREW [US]); | [X]US4458751 (HAYNES ANDREW [US]) |