|
20.05.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2018 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.08.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.2010 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.11.2009 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
24.09.2009 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.08.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
14 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |