EP2268657 - HISTIDINE RELATED COMPOUNDS FOR IDENTIFYING AND BLOCKING AMYLOID BETA ION CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 6720-A Rockledge Drive, Suite 100 Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. 1401 Rockville Pike Suite 600 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARISPE, Nelson 14812 Village Gate Dr. Silver Spring, MD 20906 / US | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09723139.3 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009US37502 | Priority number, date | US20080037857P | 19.03.2008 Original published format: US 37857 P | US20090155960P | 27.02.2009 Original published format: US 155960 P | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009117480 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2268657 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268657 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61P25/28, G01N33/68, G01N33/50 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/05 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K38/07 (EP,US);
A61K38/08 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07K14/4711 (EP,US);
C07K5/06147 (EP,US);
C07K5/1024 (EP,US);
G01N33/5041 (EP,US);
G01N33/5058 (EP,US);
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | C07K7/06, A61K38/08, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | MIT HISTIDIN VERWANDTE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND BLOCKIERUNG VON AMYLOID-BETA-IONENKANÄLEN | [2011/01] | English: | HISTIDINE RELATED COMPOUNDS FOR IDENTIFYING AND BLOCKING AMYLOID BETA ION CHANNELS | [2011/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS EN RAPPORT AVEC L'HISTIDINE POUR IDENTIFIER ET BLOQUER DES CANAUX D'IONS DE BÊTA-AMYLOÏDE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 29.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MK | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | IE | 18.03.2013 | LU | 18.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MK | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 18.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - ARISPE N ET AL, "Efficiency of Histidine-Associating Compounds for Blocking the Alzheimer's Abeta Channel Activity and Cytotoxicity", BIOPHYSICAL JOURNAL, BIOPHYSICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 95, no. 10, doi:10.1529/BIOPHYSJ.108.135517, ISSN 0006-3495, (20081115), pages 4879 - 4889, (20081115), XP025928394 [XP] 1-3,5,9-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1529/biophysj.108.135517 | [AD] - ARISPE N, "Architecture of the Alzheimer's AbetaP ion channel pore.", JOURNAL OF MEMBRANE BIOLOGY, (20040101), vol. 197, no. 1, ISSN 0022-2631, pages 33 - 48, XP002624195 [AD] 1-3,5,9-14 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 35, column 1 * * page 37, column 2 * * figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00232-003-0638-7 | [A] - ARISPE ET AL, "Abeta ion channels. Prospects for treating Alzheimer's disease with Abeta channel blockers", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. BIOMEMBRANES, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070801), vol. 1768, no. 8, doi:10.1016/J.BBAMEM.2007.03.014, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 1952 - 1965, XP022182215 [A] 1-3,5,9-14 * the whole document * * section 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamem.2007.03.014 | [XA] - "Oligohistidine target peptide sequence SeqID 1.", Geneseq, (20040311), Database accession no. ADH22656, URL: EBI, XP002624196 [X] 1-3,5,9,11 * compound . * [A] 12-14 | [A] - VALLAT P ET AL, "37. Structure-lipophilicity and structure-polarity relationships of amino acids and peptides", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA 1995 CH, (1995), vol. 78, no. 2, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 471 - 485, XP002624197 [A] 1-3,5,9-14 * the whole document * * table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19950780218 | International search | [A]US6277826 (FINDEIS MARK A [US], et al); | [A]WO2007115372 (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al); | [X] - KEIICH YOKOYAMA ET AL., "Peptide Inhibitors for Angiotensin I-Converting Enzyme from Thermolysin Digest of Dried Bonito.", BIOSCI. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 56, no. 10, pages 1541 - 1545, XP002158275 | [X] - ROSA M. TUJEBAJEVA ET AL., "Selenoprotein P Expression, Purification, and Immunochemical Characterization.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20000303), vol. 275, no. 9, pages 6288 - 6294, XP003010719 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.9.6288 | [XP] - STEVEN KNECHT ET AL., "Oligohis-tags: mechanisms of binding to Ni2+-NTA surfaces.", J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (2009), vol. 22, pages 270 - 279, XP008143127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmr.941 |