EP2269071 - METHODS AND AGENTS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF HEPATOCELLULAR CARCINOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Synthetic Rubber Corporation 8th Floor, No. 113, Section 2 Zhongshan North Rd. Taipei 104 Taiwan / TW | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states China Synthetic Rubber Corporation 7th Floor, n 113, Section 2, Zhongshan Norh Rd. Taipei 104 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAO, Kuo-Jang 119 NW 101st Court Gainesville, FL 32607 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Andrew T. 4841 Moriah Hill Road Durham, NC 27707 / US | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/40] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2011/01] | Simpson, Mark Geoffrey, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09723224.3 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009US01689 | Priority number, date | US20080069910P | 19.03.2008 Original published format: US 69910 P | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009117096 | Date: | 24.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269071 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269071 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C12Q1/68, C07K14/705 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K51/1018 (US);
A61K51/1027 (EP,US);
A61K51/1057 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/705 (KR);
C07K16/303 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (KR);
G01N33/574 (KR);
G01N33/57438 (EP,US);
G01N33/577 (US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N2333/47 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND WIRKSTOFFE ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG EINES LEBERZELLENKARZINOMS | [2011/01] | English: | METHODS AND AGENTS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF HEPATOCELLULAR CARCINOMA | [2011/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET AGENTS POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT D UN CARCINOME HÉPATOCELLULAIRE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 07.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | BG | 01.10.2014 | CY | 01.10.2014 | CZ | 01.10.2014 | EE | 01.10.2014 | FI | 01.10.2014 | HR | 01.10.2014 | LT | 01.10.2014 | LV | 01.10.2014 | MC | 01.10.2014 | MK | 01.10.2014 | MT | 01.10.2014 | PL | 01.10.2014 | RO | 01.10.2014 | SI | 01.10.2014 | SK | 01.10.2014 | TR | 01.10.2014 | GR | 02.01.2015 | IS | 01.02.2015 | PT | 02.02.2015 | IE | 18.03.2015 | LU | 18.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
BG | 01.10.2014 | ||
CY | 01.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
TR | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
MT | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SI | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
MC | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
SK | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
RO | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
EE | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 01.10.2014 | |
CZ | 01.10.2014 | ||
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
HR | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
LV | 01.10.2014 | ||
PL | 01.10.2014 | ||
GR | 02.01.2015 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CZ | 01.10.2014 | |
FI | 01.10.2014 | ||
LT | 01.10.2014 | ||
IS | 01.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 01.10.2014 | |
PT | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 01.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03023008 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 18-20,23-33,60,61 * page 229 - page 230 * * page 444 - page 460 *; | [X]WO03024392 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [X] 18-20,23-33,60,61 * page 132, lines 1-11 * * figure 54 *; | [PX]WO2008091781 (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,5,9-11,17-34,37,54-56,60-66,71-74* the whole document *; | [X] - STRICKLAND LAURA A ET AL, "Plasmalemmal vesicle-associated protein (PLVAP) is expressed by tumour endothelium and is upregulated by vascular endothelial growth factor-A (VEGF).", THE JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY AUG 2005, (200508), vol. 206, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 466 - 475, XP002535808 [X] 38-53,64,65,73-80 * page 476 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PATH.1805 | Examination | - WOLFF ANTONIO C ET AL, "AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY/COLLEGE OF AMERICAN PATHOLOGISTS GUIDELINE RECOMMENDATIONS FOR HUMAN EPIDERMAL GROWTH FACTOR RECEPTOR 2 TESTING IN BREAST CANCER", ARCHIVES OF PATHOLOGY & LABORATORY MEDICINE, COLLEGE OF AMERICAN PATHOLOGISTS, US, (20070101), vol. 131, no. 1, ISSN 0003-9985, pages 18 - 43, XP008077476 | - HO S ET AL, "INTERNAL RADIATION THERAPY FOR PATIENTS WITH PRIMARY OR METASTATIC HEPATIC CANCER: A REVIEW", CANCER, AMERICAN CANCER SOCIETY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (19981101), vol. 83, no. 9, doi:10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19981101)83:9<,1894::AID-CNCR4>,3.0.CO,2, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 1894 - 1907, XP009067538 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0142(19981101)83:9<1894::AID-CNCR4>3.0.CO;2-O | - YANG JIAHUI ET AL, "Therapeutic potential and challenges of targeting receptor tyrosine kinase ROR1 with monoclonal antibodies in B-cell malignancies.", PLOS ONE 2011 LNKD- PUBMED:21698301, (2011), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1932-6203, page e21018 | - OERNTOFT T F ET AL, "GENOME-WIDE STUDY OF GENE COPY NUMBERS, TRANSCRIPTS, AND PROTEIN LEVELS IN PAIRS OF NON-INVASIVE AND INVASIVE HUMAN TRANSITIONAL CELL CARCINOMAS", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US, (20020101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1074/MCP.M100019-MCP200, ISSN 1535-9476, pages 37 - 45, XP008015037 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/mcp.M100019-MCP200 | by applicant | US5545806 | US5545807 | WO9713852 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2551 - 2555 | - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - GETZOFF ET AL., Adv. in Immunol., (1988), vol. 43, pages 1 - 98 | - BENJAMIN ET AL., ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 2, pages 67 - 101 |