EP2255766 - DISPOSABLE PANTS-TYPE DIAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTSUBO, Toshifumi c/o Technical Center UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 1531-7 Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Knights, Rupert Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09723745.7 | 19.01.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP50615 | Priority number, date | JP20080081757 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008081757 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119136 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255766 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/49, A61F5/44, A61F13/15, A61F13/496, A61F13/511, A61F13/495 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP,US);
A61F2013/4956 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/48] | A61F13/49, A61F5/44, A61F13/15, A61F13/496, A61F13/511 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | HOSENÄHNLICHE EINWEGWINDEL | [2010/48] | English: | DISPOSABLE PANTS-TYPE DIAPER | [2010/48] | French: | COUCHE JETABLE DE TYPE CULOTTE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2010 | Translation filed | 24.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 17.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 23.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007239129 (OTSUBO TOSHIFUMI [JP]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0049] - [0050]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US6152908 (WIDLUND URBAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 15; figures 1-3 * | International search | [Y]JP2007296314 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [Y]JP2006116157 (JAPAN ABSORBENT TECH INST); | [Y]JP2003250835 (DAIO SEISHI KK); | [Y]JP2003534098 (THE PROCTER & GAMBLE CO.) | by applicant | JP2002011044 | JP2007296314 |