EP2255625 - SOLID COMPOSITION FOR PEST CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA, LTD. 3-15, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Masayuki c/o Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha Ltd. 3-15, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 02 /
AWAZU, Takao c/o Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 3-1, Nishi-shibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-0025 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Akira c/o Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 3-1, Nishi-shibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-0025 / JP | 04 /
HAMAMOTO, Taku c/o Ishihara Sangyo Kaisha Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho 3-1, Nishi-shibukawa 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-0025 / JP | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09723810.9 | 18.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009JP55348 | Priority number, date | JP20080075284 | 24.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008075284 | [2010/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119420 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2255625 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N25/08, A01P7/04 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N25/08, A01N25/14, A01N25/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.2010 | BA | 20.08.2010 | RS | 20.08.2010 | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR SCHÄDLINGSBEKÄMPFUNG | [2010/48] | English: | SOLID COMPOSITION FOR PEST CONTROL | [2010/48] | French: | COMPOSITION SOLIDE POUR LA LUTTE CONTRE LES INSECTES NUISIBLES | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2010 | Translation filed | 20.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.02.2017 | 27.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/50] | 08.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 02.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2009002856 (DU PONT [US], et al) [XP] 1-9 * claims 1-19 * * page 34, line 7 - page 41, line l * * page 28, paragraphs 8-12 * * page 27, lines 11-12 * * page 10, lines 5-29 * * page 11, line 33 - page 12, line 2 * * page 20, line 1 - page 21, line 4 *; | [XY]EP1717237 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 1-21 * * Formulation examples 1, 4, 5 and 6 * * Preparation examples 1-4 * [Y] 1-9; | [IY]US6458745 (RUNGE FRANK [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * claims 1-18 * * column 1, lines 37-54 * [Y] 1-9; | [IY]WO03039249 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * claims 1-17 * * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 5 * * page 9, lines 4-19 * * page 22, lines 1-19 * [Y] 1-9; | [IY]WO2005044221 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-9 * claims 1-10 * * page 1, lines 21-22 * * pages 19-21 * [Y] 1-9 | International search | [A]JP2005503384 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & CO.); | [A]WO2005077934 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006002984 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [A]JP2007509870 (BAYER TECHNOLOGY SERVICES GMBH); | [A]JPH1192311 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA) | by applicant | WO2005077934 | WO2007081553 |