EP2276692 - POLYMERIC FOAMS WITH NANOCELLULAR MORPHOLOGY AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJENDRAN, Santhosh Kumar No. 11, Second Town Hall St. Stuvalpet Arakkonam Tamilnadu 631001 / IN | 02 /
SINHA, Vikash Kumar House No. 786 3rd Main HAL 3rd Stage Bangalore Karnataka 560075 / IN | 03 /
SRIRAMAN, Ravi A2-302, Hari Ganga Housing Society Yerwada Pune Maharashtra 411006 / IN | 04 /
THIAGARAJAN, Chinniah A006 Millennium Habitat Kundanahalli Karnataka Bangalore 560037 / IN | 05 /
VETRIVEL, Rajappan Apt M-01 Block A Millennium Habitat, Brooke Field, Kundanahalli Main Road Bangalore 560037 / IN | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/04] | 01 /
RAJENDRAN, Santhosh Kumar No. 11, Second Town Hall St. Stuvalpet Arakkonam Tamilnadu 631001 / IN | ||
02 /
SINHA, Vikash Kumar House No. 786 3rd Main HAL 3rd Stage Bangalore Karnataka 560075 / IN | |||
03 /
SRIRAMAN, Ravi A2-302, Hari Ganga Housing Society Yerwada Pune Maharashtra 411006 / IN | |||
04 /
THIAGARAJAN, Chinniah A006 Millennium Habitat Kundanahalli Karnataka Bangalore 560037 / IN | |||
05 /
VETRIVEL, Rajappan Apt M-01 Block A Millennium Habitat Brooke Field Kundanahalli Main Road Bangalore 560037 / IN | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/04] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 09723839.8 | 23.03.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009IB51209 | Priority number, date | US20080054773 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: US 54773 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118679 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2276692 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276692 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B82B3/00, C08J9/12, C08J9/18 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
C08J9/122 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J2205/042 (EP,US);
C08J2205/044 (EP,US);
C08J2369/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | POLYMERSCHÄUME MIT NANOZELLULÄRER MORPHOLOGIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2011/16] | English: | POLYMERIC FOAMS WITH NANOCELLULAR MORPHOLOGY AND METHODS FOR MAKING THEM | [2011/04] | French: | MOUSSES POLYMÈRES AYANT UNE MORPHOLOGIE NANOCELLULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PRÉPARER CELLES-CI | [2011/04] |
Former [2011/04] | POLYMERSCHÄUME MIT NANOZELLULARER MORPHOLOGIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11172172.6 / EP2390226 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2009 | AT | 26.10.2011 | BE | 26.10.2011 | CY | 26.10.2011 | CZ | 26.10.2011 | DK | 26.10.2011 | EE | 26.10.2011 | FI | 26.10.2011 | HR | 26.10.2011 | IT | 26.10.2011 | LT | 26.10.2011 | LV | 26.10.2011 | MK | 26.10.2011 | MT | 26.10.2011 | NL | 26.10.2011 | PL | 26.10.2011 | RO | 26.10.2011 | SE | 26.10.2011 | SI | 26.10.2011 | SK | 26.10.2011 | TR | 26.10.2011 | BG | 26.01.2012 | NO | 26.01.2012 | GR | 27.01.2012 | ES | 06.02.2012 | IS | 26.02.2012 | PT | 27.02.2012 | IE | 23.03.2012 | LU | 23.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
LU | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
TR | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
MT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
FI | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
ES | 06.02.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
MK | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
IE | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 26.10.2011 | |
BE | 26.10.2011 | ||
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
IT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
RO | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
SK | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
DK | 26.10.2011 | ||
EE | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
BG | 26.01.2012 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
CY | 26.10.2011 | ||
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
HR | 26.10.2011 | ||
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
PL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
LV | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
SE | 26.10.2011 | ||
SI | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NL | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
GR | 27.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
PT | 27.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 26.10.2011 | |
LT | 26.10.2011 | ||
NO | 26.01.2012 | ||
IS | 26.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 26.10.2011 | |
NO | 26.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0319866 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0545175 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]DE19610330 (GEFINEX JACKON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003205832 (LEE L JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4217438 | US2003205832 | - KYO SUNG PARK ET AL., PNAS: EXCEPTIONAL CHEMICAL AND THERMAL STABILITY OFZEOLITIC IMIDAZOLATE FRAMEWORKS, (20060705), vol. 103, no. 27, pages 10186 - 10191 | - HOFFMANN ET AL., "Silica-Based Mesoporous Organic-Inorganic Hybrid Material", ANGEW. CHEMIE INT., (2006), vol. 45, pages 3216 - 3251 | - OMAR M. YAGHI ET AL., "Reticular Synthesis and the Design of New Materials", NATURE, (20030612), vol. 423, pages 705 - 714 | - PAUL HOLISTER ET AL., Nanotubes White Paper, CMP CIENTIFICA, (2003), pages 1 - 13 |