EP2260599 - NETWORK DEVICE OF HIGH-PRECISION SYNCHRONIZATION TYPE, NETWORK SYSTEM, AND FRAME TRANSFER METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | |||
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Junichi c/o NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 02 /
IGA, Naoto c/o NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 03 /
GOTO, Hideki c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
IIYAMA, Shinichi c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 09723889.3 | 25.03.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009IB00590 | Priority number, date | JP20080080662 | 26.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008080662 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118610 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260599 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04L12/407, H04L12/64, H04L7/08 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
H04J3/0602 (EP,US);
H04L12/407 (EP,US);
H04L7/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | HOCHPRÄZISE SYNCHRONISATIONSNETZWERKVORRICHTUNG, NETZWERKSYSTEM UND RAHMENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/50] | English: | NETWORK DEVICE OF HIGH-PRECISION SYNCHRONIZATION TYPE, NETWORK SYSTEM, AND FRAME TRANSFER METHOD | [2010/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU DU TYPE SYNCHRONISATION DE HAUTE PRÉCISION, SYSTÈME RÉSEAU, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE TRAME | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 08.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/07] | 09.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0173947 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 7 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 28 * * page 11, line 13 - line 27 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 4 * * page 20, line 11 - page 21, line 7 * * figures 1,2,5,6,11 *; | [X]US4841523 (ROFFINELLA DANIELE [IT], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 8, line 6 - line 15 * * column 9, line 30 - line 44 * * column 10, line 11 - line 64 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US5327428 (VAN AS HARMEN [CH], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [000A]; figures 15,17,27-29 * * column 5, line 45 - line 53 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 4 * * column 16, line 35 - line 49 * * column 17, line 1 - line 28 * * column 19, line 40 - line 47 *; | [A]US5687356 (BASSO CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 6, line 7 - line 46; figure 3 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 3 * * column 2, line 43 - line 54 * * column 9, line 26 - line 44 * * column 10, line 13 - line 24 * * column 11, line 18 - line 20 * * column 12, line 6 - line 20 *; | [A]US2007008993 (CHA DO-HUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * column A; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] ** paragraphs [0035] , [0036] * | Examination | US2005117596 | WO2005119951 | US2006239303 |