EP2269982 - METHOD FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF 2-AMINO-2-[2-[4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHENYL]ETHYL]-1,3-PROPANEDIOL HYDROCHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/01] | METHOD FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF 2-AMINO-2-Ý2-Ý4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHENYL ̈ETHYL ̈-1,3-PROPANEDIOL HYDROCHLORIDE | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | [2016/13] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Hidetaka c/o Development Research Laboratories Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1848 Nogi Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | 02 /
SATOH, Hiroya c/o Development Research Laboratories Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1848 Nogi Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
KOMATSU, Hidetaka c/o Research Center Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1848 Nogi Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | ||
02 /
SATOH, Hiroya c/o Research Center Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 1848 Nogi Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun Tochigi 329-0114 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/18] |
Former [2011/01] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09724232.5 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009JP55235 | Priority number, date | JP20080076124 | 24.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008076124 | [2011/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119395 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269982 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269982 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/28, C07C323/32 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07C319/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/138 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07C323/32 (KR);
C07B2200/13 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/28, C07C323/32 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KRISTALLISATION VON 2-AMINO-2-[2-[4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLORPHENYL]ETHYL]-1,3-PROPANDIOL-HYDROCHLORID | [2016/13] | English: | METHOD FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF 2-AMINO-2-[2-[4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHENYL]ETHYL]-1,3-PROPANEDIOL HYDROCHLORIDE | [2015/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CRISTALLISATION DE CHLORHYDRATE DE 2-AMINO-2-[2-[4-(3-BENZYLOXYPHÉNYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHÉNYL]ÉTHYL]-1,3-PROPANEDIOL | [2015/44] |
Former [2011/01] | VERFAHREN ZUR KRISTALLISIERUNG VON 2-AMINO-2-¦2-¦4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHENYL¿ETHYL¿-1,3-PROPANDIOL-CHLORHYDRAT | ||
Former [2011/01] | METHOD FOR CRYSTALLIZATION OF 2-AMINO-2-Ý2-Ý4-(3- BENZYLOXYPHENYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHENYL ̈ETHYL ̈-1,3-PROPANEDIOL HYDROCHLORIDE | ||
Former [2011/01] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CRISTALLISATION DE CHLORHYDRATE DE 2-AMINO-2-Ý2-Ý4-(3-BENZYLOXYPHÉNYLTHIO)-2-CHLOROPHÉNYL ̈ÉTHYL ̈-1,3-PROPANEDIOL | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2010 | Translation filed | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 09.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16157730.9 / EP3059226 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | IS | 04.09.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP1806338 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP]) [ID] 1-11 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0010] , [0012] , [0017]; example 4 *; | [ADP]EP2017257 (MITSUBISHI TANABE PHARMA CORP [JP]) [ADP] 1-11 * reference example (1-2), pages 59-60 * | International search | [A]WO03029205 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006041019 (KYORIN SEIYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007126042 (MITSUBISHI PHARMA CORP [JP], et al); | [A] - MAIKO H. ET AL., "Efficient Synthesis of the Immunomodulating Compound KRP-203", SYNTHESIS, (2007), vol. 13, pages 1927 - 1929, XP008141547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2007-983721 | [A] - MASAO C. ET AL., "An efficient total synthesis of a sphingosine-1-phosphate receptor agonist KRP-203", TETRAHEDRON, (2008), vol. 64, pages 3859 - 3866, XP022520419 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tet.2008.01.086 | by applicant | WO03029205 | WO2006041019 | WO2007043433 |