EP2280805 - CONTOUR SANDING PAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNARDI, Walter 704 Elm Place Highland Park IL 60035 / US | 02 /
LIU, Jie 4458 Saint Tropez Drive Lisle IL 60532 / US | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/06] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09724278.8 | 11.03.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009US36836 | Priority number, date | US20080079007 | 24.03.2008 Original published format: US 79007 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009120500 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2280805 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280805 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/00, B24D15/04 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
B24D15/04 (EP,US);
B24B23/005 (EP,US);
B24B23/04 (EP,US);
B24B9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | KONTURSCHLEIFKISSEN | [2011/06] | English: | CONTOUR SANDING PAD | [2011/06] | French: | PATIN DE PONÇAGE DE CONTOUR | [2011/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 14.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2009 | AT | 18.01.2012 | BE | 18.01.2012 | CY | 18.01.2012 | CZ | 18.01.2012 | DK | 18.01.2012 | EE | 18.01.2012 | FI | 18.01.2012 | HR | 18.01.2012 | LT | 18.01.2012 | LV | 18.01.2012 | MK | 18.01.2012 | MT | 18.01.2012 | NL | 18.01.2012 | PL | 18.01.2012 | RO | 18.01.2012 | SE | 18.01.2012 | SI | 18.01.2012 | SK | 18.01.2012 | TR | 18.01.2012 | IE | 11.03.2012 | LU | 11.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 18.04.2012 | NO | 18.04.2012 | GR | 19.04.2012 | ES | 29.04.2012 | IS | 18.05.2012 | PT | 18.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
LU | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
TR | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
ES | 29.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
MK | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.01.2012 | |
BE | 18.01.2012 | ||
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
SK | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2012 | ||
DK | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
RO | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
SI | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
EE | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
SE | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
CY | 18.01.2012 | ||
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
LV | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
FI | 18.01.2012 | ||
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
PL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
PT | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
HR | 18.01.2012 | ||
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
GR | 19.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NL | 18.01.2012 | ||
BG | 18.04.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 18.01.2012 | |
LT | 18.01.2012 | ||
NO | 18.04.2012 | ||
IS | 18.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE212323 (COURTOIS GABRIEL FRANÇOIS) [X] 1,3,14 * page 1, lines 15-29 * * page 1, line 44 - page 2, line 15 ** figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19544465 (SCHLATTL ALICE [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,14-17 * column 5, lines 56-59 * * column 8, lines 58-65 * * figures 3,6 * |