EP2259632 - USER DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatcho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Teruo c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
KISHIYAMA, Yoshihisa c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
HIGUCHI, Kenichi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2010/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 DE-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09724329.9 | 25.03.2009 | [2010/49] | WO2009JP55961 | Priority number, date | JP20080088105 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008088105 | [2010/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119671 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259632 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04J1/00, H04W16/32, H04W72/04, H04W72/08, H04W72/12, H04J11/00 | [2010/49] | CPC: |
H04L27/0008 (EP,US);
H04L1/0017 (EP,US);
H04L25/0228 (EP,US);
H04L27/2636 (EP,US);
H04L27/26526 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L25/03834 (EP,US);
H04L27/2614 (EP,US);
H04L5/0046 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT, BASISSTATIONSGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2010/49] | English: | USER DEVICE, BASE STATION DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2010/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR, DISPOSITIF DE STATION DE BASE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2010/49] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2010 | Translation filed | 06.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 09.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007029406 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007111187 (GE MED SYS GLOBAL TECH CO LLC) |