EP2282668 - ROBUST HIGH POWER AND LOW POWER CARDIAC LEADS HAVING INTEGRATED SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway MS LC340 Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIPPOLDT, Douglas S. 1778 Partridge Place Centerville MN 55038 / US | 02 /
BROSTROM, Thomas D 2050 Shoreline Drive Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | 03 /
O'BRIEN Richard J. 17636 Keystone Avenue North Hugo, MN 55038 / US | 04 /
SCHUGT, Michael A. 1525 Simpson Street St. Paul, MN 55108 / US | 05 /
DAVIS, Scott J. 6541 Eagle Lake Drive North Maple Grove, MN 55369 / US | 06 /
FAN, Yaling 13511 Hilsboro Avenue Savage MN 55378 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09724368.7 | 25.03.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US38242 | Priority number, date | US20080207854P | 25.03.2008 Original published format: US 207854 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009120777 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282668 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0215 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP,US);
A61B5/02152 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US);
A61B2562/187 (EP,US);
A61B5/02158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | ROBUSTE HOCHLEISTUNGS- UND NIEDERLEISTUNGS-HERZLEITUNGEN MIT INTEGRIERTEN SENSOREN | [2011/07] | English: | ROBUST HIGH POWER AND LOW POWER CARDIAC LEADS HAVING INTEGRATED SENSORS | [2011/07] | French: | CONDUCTEURS CARDIAQUES ROBUSTES DE FORTE ET DE FAIBLE PUISSANCE À DÉTECTEURS INTÉGRÉS | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 06.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0314937 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 6, line 7 - line 12; figure 5 * * page 8, line 55 - page 9, line 9; figures 7A,12 *; | [X]WO0025862 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 10, line 18 - page 45, line 14; figures 12A-13D * | by applicant | EP0314937 |