EP2268662 - HYPOALLERGENIC HYBRID PROTEINS OF MAJOR GROUP 1 AND 2 MITE ALLERGENS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bial Industrial Farmaceutica, S.A. Alameda de Urquijo 27 48008 Bilbao / ES | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASTURIAS ORTEGA, Juan Andrés Alameda de Urquijo 27 E-48008 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES | 02 /
IBARROLA LOPEZ DE DAVALILLO, Inaki Alamedade Urquijo 27 E-48008 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES | 03 /
ARILLA RODRIGUEZ, Maria Carmen Alameda de Urquijo 27 E-48008 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES | 04 /
MARTINEZ GARATE, Alberto Alameda de Urquijo 27 E-48008 Bilbao (Bizkaia) / ES | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | HGF, et al 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Harrison Goddard Foote, et al 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2011/01] | Durán Moya, Carlos, et al DURAN-CORRETJER Còrsega, 329 08037 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 09724998.1 | 24.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009IB05114 | Priority number, date | ES20080000827 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: ES 200800827 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009118642 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2268662 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/435 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/43531 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/35 (EP,CN,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C12N15/70 (CN);
A61K39/00 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | HYPOALLERGENE HYBRIDPROTEINE ALS HAUPTGRUPPE-1- UND -2-MILBENALLERGENE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON ALLERGIEN | [2011/01] | English: | HYPOALLERGENIC HYBRID PROTEINS OF MAJOR GROUP 1 AND 2 MITE ALLERGENS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALLERGIES | [2011/01] | French: | PROTÉINES HYBRIDES HYPOALLERGÉNIQUES D ALLERGÈNES MAJEURS DE MITES DE GROUPE 1 ET 2 POUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT D ALLERGIES | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 03.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2014 | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/30] | 09.03.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 09.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP11179765.0 / EP2436691 | EP11179771.8 / EP2436692 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.03.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 08.03.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 22.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1440979 (BIOMAY PROD & HANDEL [AT]); | [X]WO2006058359 (BIOMAY PROD & HANDEL [AT], et al); | Examination | US2007065468 |