Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015152148 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | US201514617136 | 09.02.2015 | US93441810 | 24.09.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8951530 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2015 | B2 | US2011052640 | 03.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5793073B | Global Dossier | 14.10.2015 | B2 | JP2011517407 | 09.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2436692 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | B1 | EP2436692 | 27.06.2012 | A3 | EP2436692 | 04.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | EP09724998 | 24.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2436691 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2017 | B1 | EP2436691 | 27.06.2012 | A3 | EP2436691 | 04.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | EP09724998 | 24.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2718994 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2017 | C | CA2718994 | 01.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2268662 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0908848 | 01.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101977929B | 19.10.2016 | B | CN101977929 | 16.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107118265 | 01.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | CN200980110215 | 24.03.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2010010353 | 05.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB05114 | 24.03.2009 | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009118642 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2009 | A3 | WO2009118642 | 01.10.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6068544B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2017 | B2 | JP2015164424 | 17.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2638271T | 19.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2638308T | 19.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES200800827 | 25.03.2008 | Type | Divisional application | EP2436691 | EP2436692 |