EP2269789 - METHOD OF PRODUCING COMPOSITE PLANT FIBER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Boshoku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8651 / JP | [2018/22] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Toyota Boshoku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1 Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWASHIRI, Hideki c/o TOYOTA BOSHOKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8651 / JP | [2018/22] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
KAWASHIRI, Hideki c/o TOYOTA BOSHOKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8651 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2011/01] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09725933.7 | 24.03.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009JP55872 | Priority number, date | JP20080084956 | 27.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008084956 | [2011/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009119618 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269789 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269789 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/04, D04H1/42, D04H1/54 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B27N3/04 (EP,US);
B27N3/002 (EP,US);
D04H1/42 (EP,US);
D04H1/4226 (EP,US);
D04H1/54 (EP,US);
D04H1/544 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/22] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDPFLANZENFASERMATERIALS | [2011/01] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING COMPOSITE PLANT FIBER MATERIAL | [2011/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATÉRIAU DE FIBRE VÉGÉTALE COMPOSITE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2010 | Translation filed | 08.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 24.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2009 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | PT | 01.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.03.2009 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IS | 30.09.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08283475 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH1170508 (AIN KOSAN KK) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2002167514 (IRIS OHYAMA INC) [A] 1-6; | [A]US2004026012 (KATO TAKEHIRO [JP], et al)[A] 1-6; | [A]CA2407880 (MUHAMMAD PERVAIZ [CA], et al) [A] 1-6; | [A]WO2006065993 (FLEXFORM TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-6; | [Y]JP2007098583 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP, et al) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH08283475 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [Y]JPH1170508 (AIN KOSAN KK); | [Y]JP2002167514 (IRIS OHYAMA INC); | [Y]JP2007098583 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU CORP, et al) |