EP2254734 - PROCESSING METHOD USING AN ELECTRIC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marquardt GmbH Schlossstrasse 16 78604 Rietheim-Weilheim / DE | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUCHS, Andreas Gutenbergstrasse 24 CH-3011 Bern / CH | 02 /
GANZ, Jochen Im Bachofen 7 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [2010/48] | Representative(s) | Otten, Herbert Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Otten, Herbert Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg/Berg / DE | ||
Former [2010/48] | Otten, Herbert Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09726136.6 | 27.03.2009 | [2010/48] | WO2009DE00396 | Priority number, date | DE20081016021 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: DE102008016021 | [2010/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009117994 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2254734 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254734 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
B25H1/0085 (EP,US);
G01S5/163 (EP);
G01S11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN MIT ELEKTROWERKZEUG | [2010/48] | English: | PROCESSING METHOD USING AN ELECTRIC TOOL | [2010/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'USINAGE AVEC UN OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2009 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | NO | 26.03.2013 | GB | 27.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | IE | 27.03.2013 | LU | 27.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | ES | 06.04.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GB | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GB | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GB | 27.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
ES | 06.04.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
NO | 26.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
NO | 26.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE10116015 (LINDNER AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,8-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] , [0043] - [0049]; figures 6-9 * [Y] 4,6; | [X]DE202004018003U (GMEINER JOSEF JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1,7-9 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0014]; figure 8 *; | [Y]EP1586805 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0071] , [0081] , [0082] , [0096]; figure 2 *; | [XA]WO02068982 (TOOLZ LTD [US]) [X] 1-2,5,8,10 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 2 * * page 10, lines 7-17 * * page 13, lines 13-19 * * page 26, lines 16-23 * [A] 7 | by applicant | DE10116015 | DE202004018003U | WO02068982 | EP1586805 |