EP2274091 - COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotage AB Box 8 751 03 Uppsala / SE | [2019/16] |
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states Biotage AB Kungsgatan 76 753 18 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Yan Skördevägen 3 S-281 33 Hässleholm / SE | 02 /
BILLING, Johan Skarpskyttevägen 4A S-226 42 Lund / SE | 03 /
YILMAZ, Ecevit Per Ols Väg 9 S-237 37 Bjärred / SE | 04 /
KARLSSON, Ola Svenshögsvägen 9 S-222 41 Lund / SE | [2011/12] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
LIU, Yan Skördevägen 3 S-281 33 Hässleholm / SE | ||
02 /
BILLING, Johan Skarpskyttevägen 4A S-226 42 Lund / SE | |||
03 /
YILMAZ, Ecevit Per Ols Väg 9 S-237 37 Bjärred / SE | |||
04 /
KARLSSON, Ola Svenshögsvägen 9 S-222 41 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/01] | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Drottninggatan 27 103 59 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/03] | Rystedt, Per Hampus, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09726217.4 | 27.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP53642 | Priority number, date | SE20080000701 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: SE 0800701 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009118401 | Date: | 01.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274091 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274091 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/32, B01J20/28, B01J20/26, B01J20/285 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
B01J20/285 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/28019 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3282 (EP,US);
B01J2220/445 (EP,US);
B01J2220/52 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | B01J20/26, B01J20/285, B01D15/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/01] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFF | [2011/03] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2011/03] | French: | MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 29.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2017 | Decision despatched | 29.03.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2009 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | NL | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | IE | 27.03.2019 | LU | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 27.03.2009 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NL | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 02.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9400214 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 25 * * page 16, line 9 - page 40, line 8; examples 15,20-22; claim 151 *; | [X]WO2005103124 (NOVATION ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOL [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0041]; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2007067140 (MIP TECHNOLOGIES AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 6, line 27; example 9; claim - *; | [X]EP0288310 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 37; example -; claim - *; | [X]US5248435 (MORITA TAKAMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, lines 6-17 * * column 3, line 56 - column 9, line 25; example -; claim - *; | [X]US4152496 (BARRETT JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 14 - column 7, line 56; example 13; claim - *; | [X]WO9409063 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 2; examples 11,12; claim - *; | [X] - WOJCIK, A.B., "Preliminary results on the gas chromatographic evaluation of interpenetrating polymer networks prepared from porous polymer beads", J. CHROMATOGR., (1990), vol. 502, pages 393 - 400, XP002532210 [X] 1-4,6,9 * page 393, paragraph 1 - page 400, paragraph 1; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)89604-7 | [X] - JIN S ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of pH-sensitivity semi-IPN hydrogel based on hydrogen bond between poly(N-vinylpyrrolidone) and poly(acrylic acid)", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 47, no. 5, ISSN 0032-3861, (20060222), pages 1526 - 1532, (20060222), XP025231454 [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * * page 1526, column R, paragraph 1 - page 1532, column R, paragraph 1; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2006.01.009 |