EP2284160 - PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE HAVING CELL-PROTECTING ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 6-15, Otsuka 5-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8650 / JP | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 2-9 Nihonbashi-Muromachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATA, Takeshi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Toshiaki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Akira c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 04 /
TADANO, Naoto c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 05 /
MATSUNO, Toshiyuki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 06 /
SATOH, Hideki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 07 /
SAITOH, Kenichi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | 08 /
OHTA, Soichi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | [2013/20] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
NAGATA, Takeshi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Toshiaki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIMURA, Akira c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
04 /
TADANO, Naoto c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUNO, Toshiyuki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
06 /
SATOH, Hideki c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
07 /
SAITOH, Kenichi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | |||
08 /
OHTA, Soichi c/o Laboratory of ZENYAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKIKAISHA 33-7 Ohizumi-machi 2-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 178-0062 / JP | Representative(s) | Jönsson, Anneli, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2013/20] |
Former [2011/07] | Jönsson, Anneli, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 09726592.0 | 31.03.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009JP56723 | Priority number, date | JP20080094365 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008094365 | [2011/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009123221 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284160 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284160 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/50, A61K31/5377, A61K31/541, A61P9/04, A61P9/10, A61P9/12, A61P17/02, A61P19/08, A61P21/00, A61P21/02, A61P25/00, A61P25/04, A61P25/08, A61P25/14 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
C07D239/50 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D239/46 (EP,US);
C07D239/48 (EP,US);
C07D239/49 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | PYRIMIDINDERIVAT MIT ZELLSCHÜTZENDER WIRKUNG UND ANWENDUNG DAVON | [2011/07] | English: | PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVE HAVING CELL-PROTECTING ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF | [2011/07] | French: | DÉRIVÉ DE PYRIMIDINE PRÉSENTANT UNE ACTIVITÉ DE PROTECTION CELLULAIRE ET SON UTILISATION | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2010 | Translation filed | 22.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 11.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2009 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 31.03.2009 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.03.2009 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0372934 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]) [Y] 1-16* page 41, line 55 - page 43, line 55; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO02098864 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * page 2, line 17 - page 3, line 23; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]JPS5049288 (THOMAE GMBH DR K); | [A]JP2001519416 (KRENITSKY PHARMACEUTICAIS, INC.); | [X] - JOHN E. CABAJ ET AL., "Bromine-Mediated Addition of Nucleophiles to the Electron-Rich Pyrimidine Subunit of Tirilazad", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 59, no. 17, pages 5090 - 5092, XP002275310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00096a068 | [X] - W. C. J. ROSS ET AL., "Some Derivatives of 4- Styrylpyrimidine", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1948), pages 1128 - 1135, XP008146467 | by applicant | - HIRSCH T ET AL., "The apoptosis-necrosis paradox", ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 1573 - 1581 | - KROEMER G ET AL., "The mitochondorial death/life regulator in apoptosis and necrosis", ANNU REV PHYSIOL, (1998), vol. 60, pages 619 - 642 | - MARTIN L, "Neuronal cell death in nervous system development, disease, and injury", INT J MOL MED, (2001), vol. 7, pages 455 - 478 | - LUKASZEVICZ A ET AL., "High sensitivity of protoplasmic cortical astroglia to focal ischemia", J CEREB BLOOD FLOW METAB, (2002), vol. 22, pages 289 - 298 | - GARCIA J ET AL., "Progression from ischemic injury to infarct following middle cerebral artery occlusion in the rat", AM PATHO, (1993), vol. 142, pages 623 - 635 | - MARTIN L ET AL., "Hypoxia-ischemia cause abnormalities in glutamate transporters and death of astroglia and neurons in newborn striatum", ANN NEUROL, (1997), vol. 42, pages 335 - 348 | - LIU D ET AL., "Astrocytic demise precedes delayed neuronal death in focal ischemic rat brain", MOL BRAIN RES, (1999), vol. 68, pages 29 - 41 | - MARAGAKIS NJ; ROTHSTEIN JD, "Mechanisms of disease: astrocytes in neurodegenerative disease", NAT CLIN PRAC NEUROL, (2006), vol. 2, pages 679 - 689 | - COTTER DR ET AL., "Glial cell abnormalities in major psychiatric disorders: the evidence and implications", BRAIN RES BULL, (2001), vol. 55, pages 585 - 595 | - WARDLAW JM ET AL., "Systematic review of evidence on thrombolytic therapy for acute ischaemic stroke", LANCET, (1997), vol. 350, pages 607 - 614 | - FLAMM E ET AL., "Free radicals in cerebral ischemia", STROKE, (1978), vol. 9, pages 445 - 447 | - CHOI D, "Glutamate neurotoxicity and diseases of the nervous system", NEURON, (1988), vol. 1, pages 623 - 634 | - KRISTIAN T; SIESJO B, "Calcium in ischemic cell death", STROKE, (1998), vol. 29, pages 705 - 718 | - BLANDINI F ET AL., "Glutamate and Parkinson's disease", MOL NEUROBIOL, (1996), vol. 12, pages 73 - 94 | - FARBER NB ET AL., "The glutamate synapse in neuropsychiatric disorders. Focus on schizophrenia and Alzheimer's disease", PROG BRAIN RES, (1998), vol. 116, pages 421 - 437 | - KIEBURTZ K, "Antiglutamate therapies in Huntington's disease", J NEURAL TRANSM SUPPL, (1999), vol. 55, pages 97 - 102 | - KEMP JA; MCKERNAN RM, "NMDA receptor pathways as drug targets", NAT NEUROSCI, (2002), vol. 5, pages 1039 - 1042 | - VAN DEN BOSCH L ET AL., "The role of excitotoxicity in the pathogenesis of amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2006), vol. 1762, pages 1068 - 1082 | - "Pharmaceutical Salts", J.PHARM.SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - S. G. SYDSERFF ET AL., BRITISH J. PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 135 | - TAKEO S ET AL., STROKE, (1992), vol. 23, pages 62 - 68 |