EP2263073 - Modular absorption measuring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/51] | MODULAR ABSORPTION MEASURING SYSTEM | ||
[2012/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASMAG-Holding GmbH Heckenau 34 4645 Grünau im Almtal / AT | [2014/46] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Nanoident Technologies AG Untere Donaulände 21-25 4020 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONNLEITNER, Max Leopold Figl Strasse 34 A-4040 Linz / AT | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2015/03] |
Former [2010/51] | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 A-4580 Windischgarsten / AT | Application number, filing date | 09726823.9 | 03.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009AT00134 | Priority number, date | AT20080000534 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: AT 5342008 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121089 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2263073 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263073 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/31, G01N21/78, // G01N21/03 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
G01N21/78 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0321 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0325 (EP,US);
G01N21/783 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | G01N21/31, G01N21/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | AL | 29.10.2010 | BA | 29.10.2010 | RS | 29.10.2010 | Title | German: | Modulares Absorptionsmesssystem | [2012/31] | English: | Modular absorption measuring system | [2012/31] | French: | Système modulaire de mesure d'absorption | [2012/31] |
Former [2010/51] | MODULARES ABSORPTIONSMESSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2010/51] | MODULAR ABSORPTION MEASURING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2010/51] | SYSTÈME MODULAIRE DE MESURE D'ABSORPTION | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 14.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 04.11.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/47] | 01.10.2014 | Resumption of proceedings | [2014/28] | 04.11.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2014/28] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2009 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | AT | 03.04.2015 | IE | 03.04.2015 | LU | 03.04.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | PT | 14.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
PT | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 03.04.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
IE | 03.04.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 03.04.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007102654 (SCHOO HARMANNUS FRANCISCUS M [NL]) [X] 1-4,10-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0020] , [0069] - [0072] - [0086] , [0090]; figure 3d *; | [Y]EP1063518 (PIERBURG INSTR GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,8,19 * paragraphs [0015] , [0015]; figure 1 *; | [Y] - MAO Y ET AL, "Efficient 4.2 [micro]m light emitting diodes for detecting CO2 at room temperature", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19960229), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 479 - 480, XP006004794 [Y] 1,2,8,19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19960275 |