EP2283133 - COMPOSITIONS AND USE OF EPAS1 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calando Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 225 South Lake Avenue 3rd Floor Pasadena, CA 91101 / US | [2012/15] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Calando Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 129 N Hill Ave, Ste 104 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIS, Mark, E. 575 Laguna Road Pasadena CA 91105 / US | 02 /
HEIDEL, Jeremy, D. 260 Kensington Drive Madison WI 53704 / US | 03 /
LIU, Joanna, Yi-Ching 6728 North Golden West Avenue Arcadia CA 91007 / US | [2011/07] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09727168.8 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US02125 | Priority number, date | US20080123069P | 04.04.2008 Original published format: US 123069 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009123764 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283133 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/713 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/113 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,KR,US);
A61K48/005 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C12N2310/122 (KR);
C12N2310/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERWENDUNG VON EPAS1-INHIBITOREN | [2011/07] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND USE OF EPAS1 INHIBITORS | [2011/07] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS D'EPAS1 | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 15.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004076639 (WYETH CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2004220393 (WARD DONNA T [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007055547 (KOREA RES INST OF BIOSCIENCE [KR], et al); | by applicant | US4426330 | US4534899 | WO8804300 | WO9011364 | US4987071 | US5013556 | US5093246 | US5108921 | WO9207065 | US5213804 | US5227170 | WO9315187 | US5264221 | WO9323569 | WO9402595 | US5334711 | US5354844 | US5356633 | US5395619 | US5416016 | US5417978 | US5459127 | US5462854 | US5469854 | US5512295 | US5521291 | US5527528 | US5534259 | US5542760 | US5543158 | US5543152 | US5547932 | US5556948 | US5580575 | US5583020 | US5591721 | US5595756 | US5627053 | WO9726270 | US5716824 | WO9810796 | WO9813526 | US5756353 | WO9831346 | US5854038 | US5858784 | WO9905094 | WO9904819 | WO9907409 | WO9914226 | WO9932619 | WO9954459 | US6001311 | US6013436 | WO0001846 | WO0027359 | US6071497 | WO0044895 | WO0044914 | US6110462 | WO0066604 | WO0066206 | US6180613 | WO0129058 | WO0136646 | WO0154664 | WO0160420 | US6294153 | WO0177350 | US6344194 | WO02053190 | WO02060412 | WO02066078 | US2002151523 | US6509323 | US2004063654 | US2004077595 | US2004087024 | US2004109888 | US2004166491 | WO2004076639 | US2004220393 | US7018609 | US2006135443 | US2006263435 | US7166302 | US2007031881 | US7217572 | WO2007055547 | US7427605 | US19980082404 |