EP2283357 - NOVEL PROTEIN FOR BINDING BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS CRY TOXINS AND FRAGMENTS OF CADHERINS FOR ENHANCING CRY TOXICITY AGAINST DIPTERANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of Georgia Research Foundation, Inc. 629 Boyd Graduate Studies Research Center 200 D.W. Brooks Dr. Athens, GA 30602-7411 / US | For all designated states Insectigen, Inc. 425 River Road Athens, GA 30602-2771 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADANG, Michael, J. 160 Tamarack Drive Athens, GA 30605 / US | 02 /
HUA, Gang 154 Oak Meadows Drive Athens, GA 30605 / US | 03 /
ABDULLAH, Mohd, Amir Fursan 907 S. Milledge Avenue Apt.b4 Athens, GA 30605 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Rui 8850 SW 73rd Lane Gainesvill, FL 32608 / US | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
ADANG, Michael, J. 160 Tamarack Drive Athens, GA 30605 / US | ||
02 /
HUA, Gang 154 Oak Meadows Drive Athens, GA 30605 / US | |||
03 /
ABDULLAH, Mohd, Amir Fursan 907 S. Milledge Avenue Apt.b4 Athens, GA 30605 / US | |||
04 /
ZHANG, Rui 150 Westpark Drive Apt. 322 Athens, GA 30606 / US | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Zwicker, Jörk Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09727226.4 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/07] | WO2009US39486 | Priority number, date | US20080072977P | 04.04.2008 Original published format: US 72977 P | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009124258 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283357 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, C12N1/20, C07K14/00 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/43563 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/50, A01N63/14 (EP,US);
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | NEUES PROTEIN ZUR BINDUNG VON CRY-TOXINEN VON BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS UND FRAGMENTE VON CADHERINEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER CRY-TOXIZITÄT GEGEN ZWEIFLÜGLER | [2011/07] | English: | NOVEL PROTEIN FOR BINDING BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS CRY TOXINS AND FRAGMENTS OF CADHERINS FOR ENHANCING CRY TOXICITY AGAINST DIPTERANS | [2011/07] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTÉINE POUR LIAISON DE TOXINES CRY DE BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS ET DE FRAGMENTS DE CADHÉRINES POUR AMÉLIORER LA TOXICITÉ CRY CONTRE DES DIPTÈRES& xA; | [2011/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 26.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 27.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - CRICKMORE N ET AL, "REVISION OF THE NOMENCLATURE FOR THE BACILLUS THURINGIENSIS PESTICIDAL CRYSTAL PROTEINS", MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (19980901), vol. 62, no. 3, ISSN 1092-2172, pages 807 - 813, XP002943531 [A] 3 * table 1 * | International search | [Y]US2005283857 (ADANG MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y] - BRAVO ET AL., "Mode of action of Bacillus thuringiensis Cry and Cyt toxins and their potential for insect control.", TOXICON, (20070315), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 423 - 435, XP026863362 |