EP2281008 - ALKYLATED AND SULFATED HYALURONAN COMPOUNDS, METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/06] | ALKYLATED SEM-SYNTHETIC GLYCOSAMINOGLYCOSAN ETHERS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEREOF | ||
[2016/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/06] | For all designated states University of Utah Research Foundation 615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESTWICH, Glenn 166 Downwind Drive P.O. Box 218 Eastbound WA 98245 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jianxing 1234 E. Alameda Ave. 23 Salt Lake City UT 84108 / US | 03 /
KENNEDY, Thomas, P. 1619 Bardstown Road Charlotte NC 28226 / US | 04 /
RAO, Narayanam 1863 S. 2600 E Salt Lake City UT 84108 / US | 05 /
XU, Xiayou 2630 Murray Holladay Road, a Holladay UT 84117 / US | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
PRESTWICH, Glenn 166 Downwind Drive P.O. Box 218 Eastbound WA 98245 / US | ||
02 /
ZHANG, Jianxing 1234 E. Alameda Ave. 23 Salt Lake City UT 84108 / US | |||
03 /
KENNEDY, Thomas, P. 1619 Bardstown Road Charlotte NC 28226 / US | |||
04 /
RAO, Narayanam 1863 S. 2600 E Salt Lake City UT 84108 / US | |||
05 /
XU, Xiayou 2630 Murray Holladay Road, a Holladay UT 84117 / US | Representative(s) | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/06] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09727633.1 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009US39498 | Priority number, date | US20080042310 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: US 42310 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009124266 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2281008 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2281008 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, C08B37/08 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/728 (EP,US);
C08B37/00 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P17/10 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/06] | C08B37/00, A61K31/728, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2011/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ALKYLIERTE UND SULFATIERTE HYALURONSÄURE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2016/12] | English: | ALKYLATED AND SULFATED HYALURONAN COMPOUNDS, METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE THEREOF | [2016/12] | French: | ACIDES HYALURONIQUES ALKYLÉS ET SULFATÉS, LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2016/12] |
Former [2011/06] | ALKYLIERTE HALBSYNTHETISCHE GLYKOSAMINGLYKOSANETHER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2011/06] | ALKYLATED SEM-SYNTHETIC GLYCOSAMINOGLYCOSAN ETHERS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/06] | ETHERS DE GLYCOAMINOGLYCOSAN SEMI-SYNTHÉTIQUES ALKYLÉS ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2009 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | LU | 03.04.2017 | MT | 03.04.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.04.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
MT | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.04.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003199687 (YALPANI MANSSUR [US]) [X] 1-4,8-12,19,37-39 * example 2; claim 7 *; | [Y]FR2864090 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR]) [Y] 1-43 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007006403 (FIDIA ADVANCED POLYMERS S R L [IT], et al) [Y] 1-43 * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 2 *; | [X] - BENESOVÁ K ET AL, "Stability evaluation of n-alkyl hyaluronic acid derivates by DSC and TG measurement", JOURNAL OF THERMAL ANALYSIS AND CALORIMETRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20060201), vol. 83, no. 2, ISSN 1572-8943, pages 341 - 348, XP019255848 [X] 1-4,8-12,19,37-39 * the whole document * | [X] - R.W. JEANLOZ, "The methyl ester of methylated hyaluronic acid", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1952), vol. 197, pages 141 - 150, XP002550040 [X] 1-4,8-12,19,37-39 * the whole document * | [Y] - ABATANGELO G ET AL, "Biocompatibility and enzymatic degradation studies on sulphated hyaluronic acid derivatives", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (19970101), vol. 18, no. 21, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 1411 - 1415, XP004092620 [Y] 1-43 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(97)00089-6 |