EP2274271 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMIDES IN THE PRESENCE OF SUPERHEATED WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRULL, Matthias Am Rheinhessenblick 27 55296 Harxheim / DE | 02 /
MORSCHHÄUSER, Roman Jakob-Nickolaus-Weg 4 55122 Mainz / DE | [2011/03] | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/03] | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Am Unisys-Park 1 DE-65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 09727743.8 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009EP01988 | Priority number, date | DE20081017219 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008017219 | [2011/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121488 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274271 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274271 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/02, C07C233/05 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C07C231/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/126 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/02, C07C233/05 (EP,US);
C07C231/02, C07C233/65 (US,EP);
C07C231/02, C07C235/06 (US,EP);
C07C231/02, C07C235/34 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2012/50] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AMIDEN IN GEGENWART VON ÜBERHITZTEM WASSER | [2011/03] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AMIDES IN THE PRESENCE OF SUPERHEATED WATER | [2011/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'AMIDES EN PRÉSENCE D'EAU SURCHAUFFÉE | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2008009541 (CHAMBERS LAURA J [GB], et al) [I] 3 * paragraph [0134] *; | [XI] - C. FERROUD ET AL, "Microwaves-assisted solvent-free synthesis of N-acetamides by amidation or aminolysis", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS., NLELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., (20080306), vol. 49, pages 3004 - 3008, XP022602751 [X] 1,2,4-6,8-13,15,16,20,21 * page 3004, column R, paragraph L - page 3005, column L, line 11; tables 1-4 * [I] 7,14,17-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2008.02.170 | [DX] - GORETZKI C ET AL, "GREEN POLYMER CHEMISTRY: MICROWAVE-ASSISTED SINGLE-STEP SYNTHESIS OF VARIOUS (METH)ACRYLAMIDES AND POLY(METH)ACRYLAMIDES DIRECTLY FROM (METH)ACRYLIC ACID AND AMINES", MACROMOLECULAR: RAPID COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (20040101), vol. 25, ISSN 1022-1336, pages 513 - 516, XP009069790 [DX] 1,2,4-9,20,21 * page 513, column R * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.200300154 | [DA] - GELENS E ET AL, "An atom efficient and solvent-free synthesis of structurally diverse amides using microwaves", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, vol. 46, no. 21, ISSN 0040-4039, (20050523), pages 3751 - 3754, (20050523), XP025386310 [DA] 1-21 * page 3753, column R, line 21 - line 40 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2005.03.146 | [DA] - VAZQUEZ-TATO M P, "MICROWAVE-MEDIATED SYNTHESIS OF AMIDES", SYNLETT, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, DE, (19930101), no. 7, ISSN 0936-5214, page 506, XP002056049 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1993-22508 | [A] - MASSICOT F ET AL, "Solvent-Free Synthesis of Tartramides Under Microwave Activation", SYNTHESIS, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (20010101), no. 16, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 2441 - 2444, XP002363367 [A] 1-21 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2001-18724 |