EP2286103 - FRICTION CLUTCH DEVICE COMPRISING A DOUBLE SHOCK-ABSORBING STEERING WHEEL FOR WHICH A SECONDARY ASSEMBLY IS FIXEDLY MOUNTED AXIALLY RELATIVE TO A REACTIVE PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 81 avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | For all designated states Valeo Embrayages 81, avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIBAUT, François 3 rue Albert Gaillard F-80330 Longueau / FR | 02 /
BERTIN, Patrice 20 rue Victor Hugo F-95540 Mery-sur-oise / FR | 03 /
FENIOUX, Daniel 11 rue Ernest Cauvin F-80480 Saleux / FR | 04 /
MEROU, Patrice 1 rue Tisserand F-80680 Sains En Amienois / FR | 05 /
DUTIER, Ivan 6 Lotissement Le Clos F-80260 Rainneville / FR | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Cardon, Nicolas, et al Valeo Embrayages Sce Propriété Intellectuelle Le Delta 14, avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Cardon, Nicolas Valeo Transmissions Sce Propriété Intellectuelle 14 Avenue des Beguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/38] | Tran, Chi-Hai Valeo Transmissions Service Propriété Intellectuelle 14 avenue des Béguines Immeuble Le Delta 95892 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09727758.6 | 18.03.2009 | [2011/08] | WO2009FR50451 | Priority number, date | FR20080051905 | 25.03.2008 Original published format: FR 0851905 | [2011/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009122096 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2286103 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2286103 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16F15/131, F16D13/58 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
F16F15/131 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (EP,US);
F16D2013/703 (EP,US);
F16D2021/0615 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2011/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | REIBKUPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM DOPPELSTOSSDÄMPFUNGSLENKRAD, FÜR DAS EINE SEKUNDÄRANORDNUNG AXIAL BEZÜGLICH EINER GEGENDRUCKPLATTE FESTGELEGT ANGEBRACHT IST | [2011/08] | English: | FRICTION CLUTCH DEVICE COMPRISING A DOUBLE SHOCK-ABSORBING STEERING WHEEL FOR WHICH A SECONDARY ASSEMBLY IS FIXEDLY MOUNTED AXIALLY RELATIVE TO A REACTIVE PLATE | [2011/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EMBRAYAGE A FRICTION COMPORTANT UN DOUBLE VOLANT AMORTISSEUR DONT UN ENSEMBLE SECONDAIRE EST MONTE FIXE AXIALEMENT PAR RAPPORT A UN PLATEAU DE REACTION | [2011/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/08] | 10.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2009 | AT | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | MT | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | GB | 18.03.2017 | IE | 18.03.2017 | LU | 18.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.03.2009 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
GB | 18.03.2017 | ||
IE | 18.03.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
LU | 18.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1361102 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]FR2886996 (VALEO EMBRAYAGES [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [DY]WO2007000151 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [DY] 3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2895476 (VALEO EMBRAYAGES [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO2007082500 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,11-13,15-17 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7-10,14; | [Y]EP1862687 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1862689 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |