EP2259854 - LOW ENERGY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DESALINATING SEAWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005-4437 / US | [2011/23] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Siemens Water Technologies Corp. 181 Thorn Hill Road Warrendale, PA 15086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GANZI, Gary, C. 74 Valleyfield Street Lexington MA 02421 / US | 02 /
LIANG, Li-Shiang 258 Bolton Road Harvard MA 01451 / US | 03 /
WILKINS, Frederick, C. 2 Sirius Lane Pepperell MA 01463 / US | 04 /
CHUA, Swee, Hoe Blk 108 Bukit Purmei Road 06-129 Singapore 090108 / SG | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | McGowan, Nigel George Siemens Shared Services Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09728027.5 | 03.04.2009 | [2010/50] | WO2009US02099 | Priority number, date | US20080042040 | 03.04.2008 Original published format: US 42040 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009123751 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2259854 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D61/48, C02F1/42, C02F1/469, // C02F1/44, C02F103/08 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
C02F1/469 (EP,US);
B01D61/44 (EP,US);
B01D61/48 (EP,US);
B01D61/485 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (EP,US);
B01D2317/02 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C02F1/4604 (EP,US);
C02F1/4674 (EP,US);
C02F1/4693 (EP,US);
C02F1/4695 (EP,US);
C02F2001/422 (EP,US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,US);
C02F2103/08 (EP,US);
C02F2209/006 (EP,US);
C02F2301/08 (EP,US);
C02F2303/16 (EP,US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US);
Y02A20/131 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/50] | B01D3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | NIEDERENERGETISCHES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTSALZUNG VON MEERWASSER | [2010/50] | English: | LOW ENERGY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DESALINATING SEAWATER | [2010/50] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DESSALEMENT D'EAU DE MER À FAIBLE ÉNERGIE | [2010/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 09.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/49] | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]WO2009038805 (SIEMENS WATER TECH CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,5,6,8,10,19,20,24,25,37,38 * figures 3, 12A * * examples 3,6 * * page 11, line 3 - line 20 * * page 19, line 19 - page 23, line 24 * * page 35, line 21 - page 41, line 32 * * page 43, line 19 - page 45, line 8 * [I] 7,9,11,12,26,28-30; | [AP] - Rohm and Haas, "Ion exchange for dummies. An introduction", (20080930), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.lenntech.com/Data-sheets/Ion-Exchange-for-Dummies-RH.pdf, (20111028), XP002662452 [AP] 1,20 * page 8 * | [A] - DARDEL DE F ET AL, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Ion Exchangers, ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY - IMMOBILIZED BIOCATALYSTS TO ISOPRENE; [ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY], VCH, WEINHEIM, PAGE(S) 393 - 459, (19890101), ISBN 978-3-527-20114-3, XP002612512 [A] 1,6,20,25 * page 408; table 4 * | International search | [Y]US2007284252 (GANZI GARY C [US], et al); | [Y]US2008067125 (WILKINS FREDERICK C [US], et al) |