EP2276733 - NOVEL DONOR-ACCEPTOR FLUORENE SCAFFOLDS: A PROCESS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council Of Scientific & Industrial Research Registration of Societies Act (Act XXI of 1860) Anusandhan Bhawan 2 Rafi Marg. New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOEL, Atul Central Drug Research Institute Chattar Manzil Palace Post Box No. 173 Lucknow 226 001 / IN | 02 /
CHAURASIA, Sumit Central Drug Research Institute Chattar Manzil Palace Post Box No. 173 Lucknow 226 001 / IN | 03 /
KUMAR, Vijay Central Drug Reseach Institute Chattar Manzil Palace Post Box No. 173 Lucknow 226 001 / IN | 04 /
MANOHARAN, Sundar Indian Institute of Technology Kanpur 208 016 / IN | 05 /
ANAND, R., S. Indian Institute of Technology Kanpur 208 016 / IN | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Jakobsson, Jeanette Helene, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2012/40] | Mattsson, Niklas, et al Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2011/04] | Mattsson, Niklas, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09728598.5 | 31.03.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009IN00215 | Priority number, date | IN2008DEL0838 | 31.03.2008 Original published format: IN DE08382008 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009122445 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2276733 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/14, C07D307/54, C07D333/24, C07D295/155, C07D207/327 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
C07D295/155 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07D207/327 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/54 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/626 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/04] | Title | German: | NEUE DONOR-AKZEPTOR-FLUORENGERÜSTE: EIN VERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2011/04] | English: | NOVEL DONOR-ACCEPTOR FLUORENE SCAFFOLDS: A PROCESS AND USES THEREOF | [2011/04] | French: | NOUVEAUX ÉCHAFAUDAGES DE FLUORÈNE DONNEUR-ACCEPTEUR : UN PROCÉDÉ ET SES UTILISATIONS | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/04] | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 20.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2017 | 31.03.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004085450 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 35 *; | [X]US2004253389 (SUZUKI KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,7-14* page 11 - page 21 *; | [X]US2005221124 (HWANG SEOK-HWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7-14 * page 4 - page 11 *; | [X] - TANG C ET AL, "Fluorene-substituted pyrenes-Novel pyrene derivatives as emitters in nondoped blue OLEDs", ORGANIC ELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.ORGEL.2006.01.001, vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 1566-1199, (20060601), pages 155 - 162, (20060601), XP024972766 [X] 1,2,7-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.orgel.2006.01.001 | [X] - KAY KWANG-YOL ET AL, "Electroluminescent Properties of Novel Fluorene Derivatives with Aromatic Amine Moieties", CAPLUS, (20060101), XP002473090 [X] 1,2,7-14 * the whole document * | [X] - PRATAP ET AL, "2-Oxobenzo[h]chromene: a novel entry for the concise and efficient synthesis of indeno[1,2-c]phenanthrenes", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.TETLET.2007.04.087, (20070523), vol. 48, no. 25, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 4379 - 4382, XP022093143 [X] 1-4,6 * Table 2, Scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetlet.2007.04.087 | Examination | - Atul Goel ET AL, "Donor-Acceptor 9-Uncapped Fluorenes and Fluorenones as Stable Blue Light Emitters + , +", ORGANIC LETTERS , 14(23), 6012-6015 CODEN: ORLEF7; ISSN: 1523-7052, (20090319), vol. 11, no. 6, doi:10.1021/ol9000679, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 1289 - 1292, XP055459901 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol9000679 |