|
26.07.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.07.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.05.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
17 |
|
17.04.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
30 |
|
15.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.10.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2017 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
06.10.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.09.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.09.2017 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
8 |
|
30.08.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
6 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.07.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.09.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.09.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
19.05.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
31 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
36 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Description |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.05.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.06.2014 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
184 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
90 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
34 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
58 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.03.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2013 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.01.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.12.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2010 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2010 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Claim deemed abandoned |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2010 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
06.08.2010 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2010 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.11.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.05.2009 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
11 |
|
13.01.2009 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |