EP2234940 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AERATED CONCRETE AND FOAMED CONCRETE, AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xella Technologie- und Forschungsgesellschaft mbH OT Emstal Hohes Steinfeld 1 14797 Kloster Lehnin / DE | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUMM, Andreas Schlaatzstrasse 17 14473 Potsdam / DE | [2011/04] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
STUMM, Andreas Stahnsdorfer Strasse 84 14482 Potsdam / DE | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/34] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | Solf, Alexander Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | Solf, Alexander Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09728906.0 | 13.01.2009 | [2010/40] | WO2009EP50312 | Priority number, date | DE20081017251 | 04.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008017251 | [2010/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121635 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2234940 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2234940 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2234940 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B111/10, B28B1/50, B28B11/14, B28B15/00, C04B28/18, C04B38/02 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
C04B38/02 (EP,US);
B28B1/50 (EP,US);
B28B11/145 (EP,US);
B28B15/00 (EP,US);
C04B28/18 (EP,US);
C04B2111/1018 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B14/06, C04B18/0418, C04B18/167, C04B20/008, C04B22/04, C04B24/18, C04B24/223, C04B24/226, C04B24/2647, C04B24/383, C04B40/0067, C04B40/024 (US,EP);
C04B28/18, C04B14/06, C04B18/0418, C04B18/167, C04B20/008, C04B22/04, C04B24/18, C04B24/223, C04B24/226, C04B24/2647, C04B24/38, C04B40/0067, C04B40/024 (US,EP);
C04B38/02, C04B14/06, C04B18/0418, C04B18/167, C04B20/008, C04B28/18, C04B40/0067, C04B40/024, C04B2103/30, C04B2103/46 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | C04B28/18, C04B38/02, B28B1/50, B28B11/14, B28B15/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/40] | C04B38/02, C04B28/18, B28B1/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2010/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PORENBETON UND SCHAUMBETON SOWIE ANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2010/40] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF AERATED CONCRETE AND FOAMED CONCRETE, AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS | [2010/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BÉTON POREUX ET DE BÉTON MOUSSE, ET INSTALLATION POUR LA MISE EN UVRE DU PROCÉDÉ | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 03.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE H+H Deutschland GmbH/ H+H International A/S Industriestrasse 3 Dampfaergevej 3 DE-23829 Wittenborn/DK-2100 Kopenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | 02
20.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Greisel Bauelemente GmbH Deichmannstrasse 2 91555 Feuchtwangen / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | 03
20.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bundesverband Porenbetonindustrie e.V. Kochstrasse 6-7 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Wischmeyer, André Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE H+H Deutschland GmbH/ H+H International A/S Industriestrasse 3 Dampfaergevej 3 DE-23829 Wittenborn/DK-2100 Kopenhagen / DE Opponent's representative Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Greisel Bauelemente GmbH Deichmannstrasse 2 91555 Feuchtwangen / DE Opponent's representative Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Königstraße 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03
20.12.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bundesverband Porenbetonindustrie e.V. Kochstrasse 6-7 10969 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Wischmeyer, André Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Großhandelsring 6 49084 Osnabrück / DE | 05.02.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 10.08.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.11.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.07.2018 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T0605/16 | 19.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 24.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T0605/16 | 18.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 17.03.2016 | Appeal received No. T0605/16 | 11.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.11.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2017 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 12.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 12.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2009 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MK | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | AT | 13.01.2014 | GB | 13.01.2014 | IE | 13.01.2014 | LU | 13.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.01.2009 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.01.2009 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2014 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
IE | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
GB | 13.01.2014 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
LU | 13.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE2043081 (YTONG AG) [X] 12,13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11,14-26; | [DY]AT177713B (SIPOREX INT AB) [DY] 1-11,14-26 * column 1 * * column 2, line 85 - line 96 * * column 5, line 40 - line 50 *; | [Y]CH263596 (INT YTONG CO A B [SE]) [Y] 2 * page 1, line 1 - line 15 * * page 3, line 15 - line 25 *; | [A]DE10066270 (XELLA BAUSTOFFE GMBH [DE]) [A] 7-9,14,15,20-22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] *; | [A]DE2060106 (BETONLEICHTBAUKOMBINAT VEB) [A] 6,14,19 * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [AD]EP1892226 (H & H DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [AD] 5,7-9,14,18,20,22 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0015] , [0016] *; | [A]WO9802391 (CHEMICAL LIME LTD [US]) [A] 5,14,18 * abstract * * page 7, line 20 - line 25 * | by applicant | DE2043081 | AT177713B | Opposition | DE454744 | US3470005 | DE19525073 | DE2601683 | DE19931898 | DE202004019019U | DE102005033454 | DE3537265 | DE10131360 | JPH04142902 | DE10041368 | DE69701091T | DE10042627 | DE19933298 | DE10232180 | WO2007088111 | DE2601681 | - GRUNDLACH H., Dampfgehärtete Baustoffe, WIESBADEN, BAUVERLAG GMBH, (19730101), pages 206 - 228 | - "BFT Betonwerk+Fertigteiltechnik, Concrete Plant+Precast Technology", BFT, (20060101), vol. BD.72, no. 12, pages 68 - 74 | - "BFT Betonwerk+Fertigteil Technik, Concrete plant+precast technology. "New developments in the AAC production process"", BFT, (20070101), vol. BD. 73, no. 4, pages 48 - 58 | - VAN BOGGELEN W.M., Autoclaved Aerated Concrete "Developments and opportunities of AAC with modern production technology", LONDON, TAYLOR & FRANCIS GROUP, (20050131), pages 11 - 21 | - KITTEL H., Lehrbuch der Lacke und Beschichtungen, STUTTGART, S. HIRZEL VERLAG, (20070101), pages 284 - 298 | - REUL H., Handbuch Bauchemie, AUGSBURG, VERLAG FÜR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, (19910101), pages 266 - 267 | - "Anlagenkonglomerat" Hess AAC" | - BÖRNER H., "Ytong, der Leichtkalkbeton, seine Eigenschaften und Erzeugung", TONINDUSTRIE ZEITUNG, (19510101), vol. BD. 75, pages 99 - 111 |