EP2271241 - SILENT BLENDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Do Brasil S.A. Rua Ministro Gabriel Passos 360 Guabirotuba - Paraná 81.520-900 Curitiba / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Electrolux Do Brasil S.A. Rua Ministro Gabriel Passos 360 81.520-900 Curitiba - PR / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUZIAN, Vanderlei Rua Coronel Joaquim Ignácio Taborda Ribas 896 Ap. 603 80.730- 330 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Bodin, Henrik AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Group Intellectual Property S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Bodin, Henrik AKTIEBOLAGET ELECTROLUX Group Intellectual Property S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09728915.1 | 31.03.2009 | [2011/02] | WO2009BR00088 | Priority number, date | BR2008MU00947U | 31.03.2008 Original published format: BR MU8800947 U | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009121154 | Date: | 08.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2271241 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 08.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/04, A47J43/08 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
A47J43/042 (EP,US);
A47J43/085 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/02] | A47J43/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | LEISER MIXER | [2011/02] | English: | SILENT BLENDER | [2011/02] | French: | MIXER SILENCIEUX | [2011/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/02] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3542178 (RIPPLE MELVIN H) [X] 1,4,5 * figures 1-6 * * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 51 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 37 * [I] 2,3; | [A]US4892413 (VATS RAJ K [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2002141285 (WILLIAMS BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2007165484 (BRANSON BENJAMIN H III [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * figure 12 * * paragraph [0006] * | International search | [A]US3542178 (RIPPLE MELVIN H); | [A]US3596692 (SWANKE ROY L); | [A]US2002141285 (WILLIAMS BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2005099884 (LEE MING-TSUNG [TW]); | [A]US2007133347 (MOK KAM SHING [CN], et al) | by applicant | US3542178 | US2007165484 |