EP2280409 - FUNCTIONAL SOLUTION SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | [2011/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIDA, Minoru c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | 02 /
NAGAI, Tatsuo c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | 03 /
YAMAKAWA, Haruyoshi c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7, Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/05] | 01 /
UCHIDA, Minoru c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAI, Tatsuo c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMAKAWA, Haruyoshi c/o Kurita Water Industries Ltd. 4-7 Nishi-shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8383 / JP | Representative(s) | Green, Mark Charles Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 3rd Floor 33 Glasshouse Street London W1B 5DG / GB | ||
Former [2011/05] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 09729203.1 | 11.03.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009JP54631 | Priority number, date | JP20080099888 | 08.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008099888 | [2011/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125642 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280409 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280409 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C25B1/28, C25B15/08 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
C25B15/08 (EP,KR,US);
C25B1/30 (KR);
C25B1/29 (EP,KR,US);
C25B15/021 (KR);
H01L21/027 (KR);
H01L21/302 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2011/05] | H01L21/304, C25B1/30, H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERSORGUNG MIT FUNKTIONALER LÖSUNG | [2011/05] | English: | FUNCTIONAL SOLUTION SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2011/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DÉLIVRANT DES SOLUTIONS FONCTIONNELLES | [2011/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2010 | Translation filed | 05.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 02.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2009 | AT | 01.08.2012 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | HR | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MK | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | NL | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SE | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | TR | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | NO | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | GB | 11.03.2013 | IE | 11.03.2013 | LU | 11.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MK | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
TR | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
GB | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
GB | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
GB | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
IE | 11.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
NL | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SE | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
HR | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
NO | 01.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP2008111184 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) [XP] 1-4,6-8 * See machine translation; page 8, paragraph 41 * * page 10, paragraph 53 - page 11, paragraph 55 ** figures 1a,2 * | International search | [A]JPH02106929 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | [A]JP2006278838 (KURITA WATER IND LTD); | [A]JP2007266495 (KURITA WATER IND LTD); | [A]JP2008053484 (KURITA WATER IND LTD) | by applicant | JP2007266495 |