EP2264623 - RECOMMENDATION INFORMATION GENERATION APPARATUS AND RECOMMENDATION INFORMATION GENERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAZAWA, Yusuke c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
HARA, Mirai c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
UENO, Hidetoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
ONOGI, Masashi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
NAGANUMA, Takefumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 06 /
ONOGI, Midori c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 07 /
KURAKAKE, Shoji c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2010/51] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09729780.8 | 02.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009JP56869 | Priority number, date | JP20080102795 | 10.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008102795 | [2010/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125712 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2264623 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/9535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR GENERIERUNG VON EMPFEHLUNGSINFORMATIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENERIERUNG VON EMPFEHLUNGSINFORMATIONEN | [2010/51] | English: | RECOMMENDATION INFORMATION GENERATION APPARATUS AND RECOMMENDATION INFORMATION GENERATION METHOD | [2010/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE RECOMMANDATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS DE RECOMMANDATION | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2010 | Translation filed | 07.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.03.2019 | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/22] | 21.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 19.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9840832 (FIREFLY NETWORK INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract ** page 18, line 25 - page 41, line 27 *; | [X]EP1835419 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0167] * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2007148817 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * page 7 - page 18 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP2000132559 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2005332265 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2007073014 (DENSO IT LAB INC) | [A] - NELLO CRISTIANINI, NELLO CRISTIANINI, NELLO CRISTIANINI, Support Vector Machine Nyumon, KYORITSU SHUPPAN CO., LTD., (20050325), pages 34 - 42 | Examination | - Ingo Schwab ET AL, "Learning User Interests through Positive Examples Using Content Analysis and Collaborative Filtering", 30 2001. Internal Memo, GMD, (20010101), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.33.9040&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20160923), XP055305042 | - OKU K ET AL, "Context-Aware SVM for Context-Dependent Information Recommendation", MOBILE DATA MANAGEMENT, 2006. MDM 2006. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE O N NARA, JAPAN 10-12 MAY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060510), doi:10.1109/MDM.2006.56, ISBN 978-0-7695-2526-6, pages 109 - 109, XP010918027 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MDM.2006.56 | - Dunja Mladenic, "Personal WebWatcher: design and implementation", (19960101), URL: http://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.49.2143&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20160923), XP055305045 | by applicant | JP2002215665 |