EP2270074 - SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR WATER-ABSORBING RESIN AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR WATER-ABSORBING RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/01] | SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN | ||
[2020/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd. 1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOTOYAMA, Atsushi c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Seiji c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Makoto c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | 04 /
KAWANO, Takaaki c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 5-8, Nishiotabicho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0034 / JP | 05 /
IRIE, Yoshio c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | [2021/21] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
MOTOYAMA, Atsushi c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | ||
02 /
KATO, Seiji c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | |||
03 /
MATSUMOTO, Makoto c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | |||
04 /
KAWANO, Takaaki c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 5-8, Nishiotabicho Suita-shi Osaka 564-0034 / JP | |||
05 /
IRIE, Yoshio c/o Nippon Shokubai Co. Ltd. 992-1, Aza Nishioki Okihama Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1282 / JP | Representative(s) | Mai Besier European Trademark Attorneys Patentanwälte Kreuzberger Ring 18a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/21] |
Former [2012/07] | Mai, Dörr, Besier Patentanwälte Steuerberater/Wirtschaftsprüfer John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 09729856.6 | 10.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009JP57391 | Priority number, date | JP20080103891 | 11.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008103891 | [2011/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009125849 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2270074 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2270074 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/24, C08J3/12, C08F220/06 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
C08J3/128 (EP,US);
C08J3/24 (EP,US);
C08L33/02 (EP,US);
C08F220/06 (EP,US);
C08J2300/14 (EP,US);
C08J2333/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/06, C08F222/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | C08J3/24, C08J3/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/21] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON WASSERABSORBIERENDEM HARZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERABSORBIERENDEM HARZ | [2020/52] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD FOR WATER-ABSORBING RESIN AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR WATER-ABSORBING RESIN | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE POUR RÉSINE ABSORBANT L'EAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR RÉSINE ABSORBANT L'EAU | [2020/50] |
Former [2011/01] | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES WASSERABSORBIERENDEN HARZES UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES WASSERABSORBIERENDEN HARZES | ||
Former [2011/01] | SURFACE TREATMENT METHOD OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN AND PRODUCTION METHOD OF WATER-ABSORBING RESIN | ||
Former [2011/01] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE D UNE RÉSINE ABSORBANT L EAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D UNE RÉSINE ABSORBANT L EAU | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2010 | Translation filed | 08.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.04.2009 | AT | 26.05.2021 | CY | 26.05.2021 | CZ | 26.05.2021 | DK | 26.05.2021 | EE | 26.05.2021 | ES | 26.05.2021 | FI | 26.05.2021 | HR | 26.05.2021 | IT | 26.05.2021 | LT | 26.05.2021 | LV | 26.05.2021 | MC | 26.05.2021 | MK | 26.05.2021 | MT | 26.05.2021 | NL | 26.05.2021 | PL | 26.05.2021 | RO | 26.05.2021 | SE | 26.05.2021 | SI | 26.05.2021 | SK | 26.05.2021 | BG | 26.08.2021 | NO | 26.08.2021 | GR | 27.08.2021 | IS | 26.09.2021 | PT | 27.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.04.2009 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
MK | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.04.2009 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CY | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.04.2009 | |
AT | 26.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
MC | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
IT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SI | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
EE | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
RO | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
SK | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
CZ | 26.05.2021 | ||
DK | 26.05.2021 | ||
ES | 26.05.2021 | ||
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
NL | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
PL | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
IS | 26.09.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
PT | 27.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
HR | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
LV | 26.05.2021 | ||
SE | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
NO | 26.08.2021 | ||
GR | 27.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | ||
BG | 26.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 26.05.2021 | |
FI | 26.05.2021 | ||
LT | 26.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002121291 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-3,8,13* paragraphs [0034] , [0052] , [0073] , [0076]; example 1 *; | [XY]JP2002201290 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-3,8,13 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [0039] , [0040] , [0051] - [0055]; examples 8,9 * [Y] 1-13; | [X]JP2003082107 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-3,7,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0043] , [0048] , [0052] , [0093]; examples 1,2; claim 1; table 1 *; | [Y]EP1800740 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0030] , [ 0136] , [0210] , [0242] - [0246]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2002121291 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2002201290 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2002212204 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [A]JP2003082107 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2008038128 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | by applicant | US272471 | US4093776 | US4286082 | US4367323 | US4446261 | US4625001 | US4683274 | JPS6399211 | US4873299 | US4973632 | US4985518 | US5124416 | US5145906 | US5244735 | US5250640 | US5264495 | US5380808 | JP2530668B | JPH09509591 | EP0811636 | EP0922717 | EP0955086 | US6071976 | US6143821 | US6164455 | US6228930 | US6254990 | US2001016668 | US6378453 | US6559239 | US6596901 | US6710141 | US6720389 | US2004106745 | WO2004069915 | US2005048221 | US6906159 | US2006024755 | US7049366 | WO2006074816 | US2007149760 | WO2008037672 | WO2008037673 | WO2008037675 | WO2008123477 | - Modern Superabsorbent Polymer Technology, WILEY-VCH, page 97 |