EP2274089 - PYROLYSIS FURNACE AND PROCESS TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMISSHIELD, INC. 2000 Kraft Drive, Suite 2600 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | For all designated states Olver, John W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | For all designated states Simmons, Jason 212 Round Hill Drive Christiansburg, VA 24073 / US | [2021/01] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states EMISSHIELD, INC. 2000 Kraft Drive, Suite 2600 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
For all designated states Olver, John W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | |||
For all designated states Simmons, Jason 1001 Tom's Creek Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | |||
Former [2011/03] | For all designated states WESSEX INCORPORATED 2000 Kraft Drive, Suite 2600 Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
For all designated states Olver, John W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | |||
For all designated states Simmons, Jason 1001 Tom's Creek Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLVER, John, W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
SIMMONS, Jason 212 Round Hill Drive Christiansburg, VA 24073 / US | [2022/02] |
Former [2011/21] | 01 /
OLVER, John, W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
SIMMONS, Jason 212 Round Hill Drive Christiansburg VA 24073 / US | |||
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
OLVER, John, W. 806 Draper Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | ||
02 /
SIMMONS, Jason 1001 Tom's Creek Road Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/02] |
Former [2011/03] | Carter, Stephen John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09730180.8 | 07.04.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US39701 | Priority number, date | US20080099100 | 07.04.2008 Original published format: US 99100 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009126593 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2274089 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274089 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/04, F27B14/08, B05D1/02 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
C10G9/20 (EP,US);
B01J19/02 (US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089 (EP,US);
C04B41/85 (EP,US);
C10G2400/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/18 (EP,US);
C04B41/5089, C04B41/5035, C04B41/507 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | PYROLYSEOFEN UND PROZESSROHRE | [2011/03] | English: | PYROLYSIS FURNACE AND PROCESS TUBES | [2011/03] | French: | FOUR DE PYROLYSE ET TUBES DE TRAITEMENT | [2011/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 18.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2009 | AT | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | MT | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | TR | 12.01.2022 | IE | 07.04.2022 | LU | 07.04.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | GB | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
TR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
MK | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
IE | 07.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
LU | 07.04.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
GB | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NO | 12.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3972682 (STEPHENS THOMAS M, et al) [Y] 1-15 * see col.2, lines 54-68; figure 1 and claims 1-8. *; | [Y]US4469721 (SHIOYA KIYOHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4963301 (DAVIS H O [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * see figure 1, table at col. 6 and claims 1-15 *; | [Y]EP0672630 (AEROSPATIALE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0993497 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US]) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]US6921431 (EVANS TIMOTHY G [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12-15 * see in particular examples 1-4 and claims 1-32 * [Y] 1-14 | International search | [Y]US3607125 (KYDD PAUL H); | [Y]US6210747 (TROTTER JR DONALD M [US]); | [A]US6322879 (STEWART RONALD L [US], et al); | [A]US6423415 (GREENE MARGARET E [US], et al); | [Y]US2003213687 (PLATVOET ERWIN M J [US], et al); | [X]US2005051057 (EVANS TIMOTHY O [US], et al); | [Y]US2006156958 (SIMMONS JASON A [US], et al) |