EP2279229 - TRANSPARENT ADHESIVE SHEET AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA, Jun 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 02 /
TAKEDA, Hikaru 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 03 /
TAKAMATSU, Yorinobu 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 04 /
SUWA, Toshihiro 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Shunsuke 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 06 /
KOBAYASHI, Hiroyuki 33, 1 Tamagawadai 2-chome Setagaya Tokyo 158-8583 / JP | 07 /
EVERAERTS, Albert, I. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-427 / US | [2011/05] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/05] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09730862.1 | 03.04.2009 | [2011/05] | WO2009US39465 | Priority number, date | JP20080103994 | 11.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008103994 | JP20080318842 | 15.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008318842 | [2011/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009126532 | Date: | 15.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2279229 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/02 | [2011/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/133308 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/22 (KR);
C09J133/04 (KR);
C09J133/14 (EP,KR,US);
C09J4/00 (KR);
C09J7/10 (EP,US);
C09J7/385 (KR);
C09J2203/318 (KR);
C09J2301/302 (KR);
C09J2433/00 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2201/50 (EP,KR,US);
G02F2202/28 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/05] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE KLEBFOLIE UND SIE ENTHALTENDES BILDSCHIRMGERÄT | [2011/05] | English: | TRANSPARENT ADHESIVE SHEET AND IMAGE DISPLAY DEVICE INCLUDING THE SAME | [2011/05] | French: | FEUILLE ADHÉSIVE TRANSPARENTE ET DISPOSITIF D AFFICHAGE D IMAGE LA COMPORTANT | [2011/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/05] | 12.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59172603 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]WO9708260 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]JP2599469B (FUJITSU LTD.); | [X]WO9929795 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]WO2005065530 (FIRST WATER LTD [GB], et al) |