EP2274045 - EXTENSIBLE IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH CO-AXIAL CONDUCTOR COILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55342-5604 / US | [2011/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEXANDER, James A. 27035 Noble Road Shorewood Minnesota 55331 / US | 02 /
METZLER, Michael E. 351 Dupont Ave. S. Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | 03 /
DORFF, Jon P. 1315 52nd Avenue Fridley Minnesota 55421 / US | [2011/12] |
Former [2011/03] | 01 /
ALEXANDER, James A. 27035 Noble Road Shorewood Minnesota 55331 / US | ||
02 /
METZLER, Michael E. 6959 Tartan Curve Eden Prairie MN 55346 / US | |||
03 /
DORFF, Jon P. 1315 52nd Avenue Fridley Minnesota 55421 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2017/01] |
Former [2011/03] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09731687.1 | 23.01.2009 | [2011/03] | WO2009US31783 | Priority number, date | US20080045644 | 17.04.2008 Original published format: US 45644 | [2011/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128967 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2274045 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2274045 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
A61N1/0534 (EP,US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/0472 (US);
A61N1/0488 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2011/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUSZIEHBARE IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE LEITUNG MIT KOAXIALEN LEITERSPULEN | [2011/03] | English: | EXTENSIBLE IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH CO-AXIAL CONDUCTOR COILS | [2011/03] | French: | CONDUCTEURS EN FORME DE SPIRE DESTINÉS À UNE SONDE DE STIMULATION CÉRÉBRALE PROFONDE | [2016/31] |
Former [2011/03] | CÂBLE MÉDICAL IMPLANTABLE EXTENSIBLE COMPRENANT DES BOBINES CONDUCTRICES CO-AXIALES | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 21.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2009 | AT | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | ES | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | IE | 23.01.2017 | LU | 23.01.2017 | MT | 23.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | GB | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.01.2009 | |
AT | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
MT | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 23.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 04.01.2017 | |
ES | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | ES | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005222656 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0036] , [0039] , [0042] , [0043] , [0065]; figures 2,6-8,10,11,16-18 *; | [A]US2005222647 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] - [0046] , [0059] , [0061] , [0066]; figure - *; | [X]US2006200218 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0014] , [0051] , [0054] , [0074] - [0077]; figure - *; | [A]US2006247748 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0057] - [0060] - [0064] - [0066]; figure - * |