EP2280835 - PRINTED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novalia Ltd The Quorum Barnwell Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB5 8RE / GB | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STONE, Kate 7 Prince William Court Victoria Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 3NL / GB | 02 /
BLACKBURN, Mary 132 Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 1LE / GB | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
STONE, Kate 7 Prince William Court Victoria Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 3NL / GB | ||
02 /
BLACKBURN, Mary 132 Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 1LE / GB | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | ||
Former [2011/06] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09731797.8 | 09.04.2009 | [2011/06] | WO2009GB50350 | Priority number, date | GB20080006804 | 15.04.2008 Original published format: GB 0806804 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127858 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2280835 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2280835 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2280835 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/02 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
B42D15/022 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/11] |
Former [2011/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BEDRUCKTER ARTIKEL | [2011/06] | English: | PRINTED ARTICLE | [2011/06] | French: | ARTICLE IMPRIMÉ | [2011/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2009 | AT | 20.02.2013 | BE | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | IT | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MC | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | IE | 09.04.2013 | LU | 09.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
IE | 09.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
IT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
BE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9700783 (FRASER TIMOTHY JAMES CAMERON [GB]); | [A]EP1512547 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]); | [A]US2006145469 (LUBRINO ENRICO [US], et al); | [XAI]US2007109780 (LEE WING H R [HK], et al) | by applicant | US2007109780 |