EP2263169 - COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND METHOD OF PROVIDING UNIFIED INTERFACE TO THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | For all designated states Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Sogang University 1-1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | [2019/14] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Sogang University 1-1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | |||
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states Industry-University Cooperation Foundation Sogang University 1-1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Myeong Gi No. 1206 Munhwa Dreamvill 549-36 Bupyeong-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon Metropolitan City 403-010 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Young Hee No. 42-1 Donam 1-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-061 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Kwang Choon No. 12-401 Samsung 3-cha 1217-7 Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-374 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Jung Yun Sogang Univ. 1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | 05 /
SEON, Choong Nyoung Sogang Univ. 1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | [2019/14] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
JEONG, Myeong Gi No. 1206 Munhwa Dreamvill 549-36 Bupyeong-dong Bupyeong-gu Incheon Metropolitan City 403-010 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Young Hee No. 42-1 Donam 1-dong Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-061 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Kwang Choon No. 12-401 Samsung 3-cha 1217-7 Maetan 4-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-374 / KR | |||
04 /
SEO, Jung Yun Sogang Univ. 1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | |||
05 /
SEON, Choong Nyoung Sogang Univ. 1 Sinsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-110 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2010/51] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09731869.5 | 14.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009KR01903 | Priority number, date | KR20080034361 | 14.04.2008 Original published format: KR 20080034361 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009128633 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2263169 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2263169 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.01.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/20, H04M1/725, G06F17/27, G06F17/30, G06F17/21, G06F17/24, G06F3/0481, H04M1/2745 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
H04M1/2753 (EP,US);
G06F16/3322 (EP,US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F40/166 (US);
G06F40/279 (EP,US);
G06F40/284 (EP,US);
H04L51/046 (EP,US);
H04L51/56 (EP,US);
H04M1/72403 (EP,US);
H04M1/72436 (EP,US);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04M1/72451 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | G06F17/20, H04M1/725, G06F17/27 | ||
Former IPC [2010/51] | G06F17/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2010/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER VEREINHEITLICHTEN SCHNITTSTELLE DAFÜR | [2010/51] | English: | COMMUNICATION TERMINAL AND METHOD OF PROVIDING UNIFIED INTERFACE TO THE SAME | [2010/51] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE INTERFACE UNIFIÉE POUR CE DERNIER | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19163061.5 / EP3518476 | EP19217435.7 / EP3664385 | EP23181793.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2009 | AT | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | ES | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | IT | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | IE | 14.04.2019 | LU | 14.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | FR | 03.06.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.04.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.04.2009 | |
AT | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 03.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
LU | 14.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | CZ | 03.04.2019 | |
ES | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 03.04.2019 | |
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5946647 (MILLER JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004148170 (ACERO ALEJANDRO [US], et al) [Y] 2,9 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0083] *; | [XYI]US2006010379 (KASHI RAMANUJAN [IN]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0128] * * figures 1A,1B,1D-4B * [Y] 2,9 [I] 3-7,10-14; | [A]WO2007102045 (C D C S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I] - "Chapter 2 Related Work", (20010701), URL: http://www.cs.cmu.edu/~rcm/papers/thesis/ch2.pdf, (20160504), XP055270642 [I] 1,8 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005066269 (WANG JUN [CN], et al); | [A]KR20070023014 (PANTECH & CURITEL COMMUNICATIONS, INC.) | by applicant | US2004148170 | US2006010379 |