EP2265444 - MACHINE UNIT OF A PRINTING SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST ONE ACTUATOR WHICH IS CONTROLLED BY A CONTROL UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Str. 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜCHNER, Detlef, Alfons Öhlberg 29a 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
HÜBLEIN, Jürgen Würzburger Straße 56 97250 Erlabrunn / DE | [2010/52] | Representative(s) | Koenig & Bauer AG - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 09731882.8 | 02.03.2009 | [2010/52] | WO2009EP52455 | Priority number, date | DE20081001214 | 16.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008001214 | [2010/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127465 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265444 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B41F33/0009 (EP);
B41P2233/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/52] | Title | German: | MASCHINENEINHEIT EINER DRUCKANLAGE MIT MINDESTENS EINEM VON EINER STEUEREINHEIT GESTEUERTEN AKTOR | [2010/52] | English: | MACHINE UNIT OF A PRINTING SYSTEM HAVING AT LEAST ONE ACTUATOR WHICH IS CONTROLLED BY A CONTROL UNIT | [2010/52] | French: | UNITÉ MÉCANIQUE D'UNE INSTALLATION D'IMPRESSION, AVEC AU MOINS UN ACTIONNEUR COMMANDÉ PAR UNE UNITÉ DE COMMANDE | [2010/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0243811 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,11,14,15 * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * * column 2, line 17 - line 50 * * column 3, line 6 - line 44; figure 3 *; | [X]DE20014136U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,9,11-13,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 2, line 14 - line 26 * * page 3, line 6 - line 11 * * page 4, line 5 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1247656 (GRAPHA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1,7 *; | [AD]EP1454747 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * | Examination | US5854904 |