EP2306888 - METHOD OF EYE REGISTRATION FOR OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optovue, Inc. 45531 Northport Loop West Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2011/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Jay 910 Yakima Dr. Fremont CA 94539 / US | 02 /
JANG, Ben, Kwei 10160 Macadam Lane Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 03 /
LUH, Shuw-shenn 910 Yakima Dr Fremont CA 94539 / US | 04 /
DENG, Yuanmu 45531 Northport Loop W. Fremont CA 94539 / US | [2011/15] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/15] | Schurack, Eduard F. Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09732715.9 | 14.04.2009 | [2011/15] | WO2009US02343 | Priority number, date | US20080124109P | 14.04.2008 Original published format: US 124109 P | [2014/24] |
Former [2011/15] | US20080124109 | 14.04.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128912 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306888 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61B3/12, A61B5/00 | [2011/15] | CPC: |
A61B3/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUGENREGISTRIERUNG FÜR DIE OPTISCHE KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAPHIE | [2011/15] | English: | METHOD OF EYE REGISTRATION FOR OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY | [2011/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D' ENREGISTREMENT OCULAIRE POUR TOMOGRAPHIE EN COHÉRENCE OPTIQUE | [2011/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 05.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012 | 30.04.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004263785 (CHERNYAK DIMITRI [US]) [X] 1,5,7,20,21 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0096] * * figures 4-6,6A * * claims 1-5,17,21 * [Y] 2-4,6,8-19; | [Y]WO2007084748 (OPTOVUE INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,6,8-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 5-10 * * claims 8,9,17 *; | [A]US2007115481 (TOTH CYNTHIA A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO0178584 (ALCON UNIVERSAL LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006078802 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-9 * | by applicant | WO2004113958 | WO2007084748 |