EP2276516 - BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE POLYESTER BLOCK AND A POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) BLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054-2807 / US | [2011/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TROLLSAS, Mikael, O. 5989 Hosta Lane San Jose CA 95124 / US | 02 /
NGO, Michael, Huy 704 Villa Centre Way San Jose CA 95128 / US | 03 /
HOSSAINY, Syed, F.A. 29885 Bellow View Place Hayward, CA 94544 / US | 04 /
SHERMAN, David, J. 5719 Chimineas Avenue Tarzana CA 91356 / US | [2011/04] | Representative(s) | Jané Bonet, Montserrat ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Jané Bonet, Montserrat ZBM PATENTS Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Pl. Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2011/04] | Jané Bonet, Montserrat ZBM PATENTS Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Pl. Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 09732729.0 | 17.04.2009 | [2011/04] | WO2009US41031 | Priority number, date | US20080106212 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: US 106212 | [2011/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009129503 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2276516 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2276516 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/06, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L31/16 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/047 (US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L67/04 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L71/02 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2011/04] | A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L31/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/29] |
Former [2011/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BLOCKCOPOLYMER MIT ZUMINDEST EINEM POLYESTER-BLOCK UND EINEM POLY(ETHYLENGLYKOL)BLOCK | [2011/04] | English: | BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE POLYESTER BLOCK AND A POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) BLOCK | [2011/04] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE BLOC COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN BLOC POLYESTER ET UN BLOC POLY(ÉTHYLÈNE GLYCOL) | [2011/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/17] | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16177016.9 / EP3108905 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2009 | AT | 20.07.2016 | BE | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | ES | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | IT | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | GR | 21.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | LU | 17.04.2017 | MT | 17.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.04.2009 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 17.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
BE | 20.07.2016 | ||
ES | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
GR | 21.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
IT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2005112170 (HOSSAINY SYED F [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11-26,33,35-40 * page 1, paragraph 9 - paragraph 10 * * page 2, paragraph 18 * * page 3, paragraph 38 - paragraph 39 * * page 4, paragraph 46 - paragraph 50 * * page 5, paragraph 63 * * claims 1-7 *; | [XI]US2007026043 (GUAN DECHI [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,11-26,33,35-40 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 3, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraph 75 - paragraph 77 * * page 5, paragraph 82 - paragraph 87 * * page 5, paragraph 94 * * page 6, paragraph 105 * * claims 1-94 * [I] 5-10,27-32,34; | [X]EP1891993 (BIOTRONIK VI PATENT AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,11-26,33-40 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraph 8 - column 3, paragraph 13 * * column 4, paragraph 15 - paragraph 17 * * claims 1-6 *; | [E]WO2009148926 (ABBOT CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS I [US], et al) [E] 1-40 * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 15 * * page 7, line 7 - line 13 ** claims 1-8 *; | [E]WO2010021883 (ABBOTT CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEMS [US], et al) [E] 1-40 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 9 * * claims 1-3,10-18,31,32 * | Examination | - ASTETE CARLOS E ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of PLGA nanoparticles", JOURNAL OF BIOMATERIALS SCIENCE. POLYMER EDITION, VSP, UTRECHT, NL, (20060101), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0920-5063, pages 247 - 289, XP009134610 |