Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8410672 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2013 | B2 | US2011031864 | 10.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5283750B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B2 | JP2011518436 | 23.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2269429 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | B1 | EP2269429 | 05.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09732751 | 10.04.2009 | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE532400T | 15.11.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102007830B | 09.07.2014 | B | CN102007830 | 06.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2376710T | 16.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2495507 | 10.10.2013 | C2 | RU2010146650 | 27.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009IB51521 | 10.04.2009 | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009128005 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100133491 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201008474 | 16.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP08154716 | 17.04.2008 |