EP2262822 - ALKYL AND/OR ALKENYL ETHER OF AKLYL AND/OR ALKENYL(POLY)GLYCOSIDES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Cognis IP Management GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHLER, Ansgar Siegfriedstr. 80 46240 Bottrop / DE | 02 /
ANSMANN, Achim Kirchberg 25 40699 Erkrath / DE | 03 /
WEICHOLD, Catherine Roermonder Straße 110 52072 Aachen / DE | 04 /
CLASEN, Frank Am Bandsbusch 46 40723 Hilden / DE | 05 /
WICK, Anja Forstbachstr. 22 40723 Hilden / DE | 06 /
MAHNKE, Eike Ulf Thoedor-Körner-Str. 18 42553 Velbert / DE | 07 /
KLOTZ, Bjoern Fabershof 21 40699 Erkrath / DE | 08 /
NEUMANN, Carsten Blumenthalstr. 15 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | 09 /
HLOUCHA, Matthias Metzer Str. 3 50677 Köln / DE | 10 /
KAWA, Rolf Fontanestr. 28 40789 Monheim / DE | 11 /
SCHULTE, Petra Nettelbeckstraße 4 50733 Köln / DE | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/39] | Application number, filing date | 09732936.1 | 06.04.2009 | [2010/51] | WO2009EP02511 | Priority number, date | EP20080007291 | 14.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08007291 | EP20080019490 | 07.11.2008 Original published format: EP 08019490 | [2010/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009127339 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2262822 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2262822 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04, A61K8/60 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/604 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/21 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/51] | Title | German: | ALKYL- UND/ODER ALKENYLETHER VON ALKYL- UND/ODER ALKENYL(POLY)GLYCOSIDEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2010/51] | English: | ALKYL AND/OR ALKENYL ETHER OF AKLYL AND/OR ALKENYL(POLY)GLYCOSIDES AND USE THEREOF | [2010/51] | French: | ETHERS ALKYLIQUES ET/OU ALCÉNYLIQUES D'ALKYL- ET/OU D'ALCÉNYL(POLY)GLYCOSIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 16.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2009 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HR | 28.09.2011 | IE | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MK | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | NO | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | LU | 06.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
LU | 06.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 28.09.2011 | |
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
HR | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
NO | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0304627 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [DA]EP0364852 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]DE4439091 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]DE19726785 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]); | [A]EP1502644 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE4439091 | DE19726785 |