EP2176075 - OMNI-DIRECTIONAL WHEEL AND METHOD FOR THE INSTALLATION OF ROLLER BODIES OF AN OMNI-DIRECTIONAL WHEEL, AND OMNI-DIRECTIONAL MOVABLE CHASSIS AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Roboter GmbH Zugspitzstrasse 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2010/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUDNIOK, Sven Sigmundstrasse 7 1/2 86157 Augsburg / DE | [2010/16] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR Sigmundstraße 1 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | Patentanwälte Funk & Böss GbR Sigmundstraße 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734103.6 | 20.04.2009 | [2010/16] | WO2009EP02861 | Priority number, date | DE20081019976 | 21.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008019976 | [2010/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009129978 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2176075 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2176075 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60B19/12 | [2010/16] | CPC: |
B60B19/125 (EP,US);
B60B19/003 (EP,US);
B60B2310/202 (EP,US);
B60B2310/226 (EP,US);
B60B2310/305 (EP,US);
B60B2380/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/16] | Title | German: | OMNIDIREKTIONAL-RAD UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE VON ROLLKÖRPERN EINES OMNIDIREKTIONAL-RADES, SOWIE OMNIDIREKTIONAL BEWEGLICHES FAHRWERK UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2010/16] | English: | OMNI-DIRECTIONAL WHEEL AND METHOD FOR THE INSTALLATION OF ROLLER BODIES OF AN OMNI-DIRECTIONAL WHEEL, AND OMNI-DIRECTIONAL MOVABLE CHASSIS AND THE USE THEREOF | [2010/16] | French: | ROUE OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE, PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE DE CORPS ROULANTS D'UNE ROUE OMNIDIRECTIONNELLE, CHÂSSIS MOBILE OMNIDIRECTIONNEL ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2010/16] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 25.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HR | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IE | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | MK | 16.03.2011 | MT | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | LU | 20.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | NO | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
LU | 20.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
LU | 20.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
MT | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HR | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 16.03.2011 | |
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
NO | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2354404 (ILON B E) [A] 1-11* figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]GB2242173 (SECRETARY TRADE IND BRIT [GB]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO03068352 (BSTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [AD]DE202005012682U (IC IND CONSULTING GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * |