EP2269055 - PREPARATION OF LIQUID MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 75184 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BJÖRKESTEN, Lennart Björkgatan 30 S-751 84 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
CARREDANO, Enrique Björkgatan 30 S-751 84 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
MALMQUIST, Gunnar Björkgatan 30 S-751 84 Uppsala / SE | 04 /
RODRIGO, Gustav Björkgatan 30 S-751 84 Uppsala / SE | 05 /
STAFSTRÖM, Nils Björkgatan 30 S-751 84 Uppsala / SE | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | Sörby, Lennart GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Sörby, Lennart GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 75184 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Sörby, Lennart GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Björkgatan 30 75184 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 09734212.5 | 20.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009SE50399 | Priority number, date | SE20080000915 | 21.04.2008 Original published format: SE 0800915 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131524 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269055 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269055 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/34, B01D15/12, B01J39/00, B01J41/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
B01D15/12 (EP,US);
B01D15/166 (EP,US);
B01D15/361 (EP,US);
G01N30/34 (EP,US);
G01N2030/347 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG FLÜSSIGER MISCHUNGEN | [2011/01] | English: | PREPARATION OF LIQUID MIXTURES | [2011/01] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE MÉLANGES LIQUIDES | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2010 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 14.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2009 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | HR | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | MK | 09.11.2011 | MT | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | NO | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | LU | 20.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
LU | 20.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
MT | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
MK | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 09.11.2011 | |
HR | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NO | 09.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US6221250 (STAFSTROEM NILS [SE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - LAKSHMI N ROY ET AL, "Buffer Standards for the Physiological pH of the Zwitterionic Compound, TAPS, From 5 to 55 not C", JOURNAL OF SOLUTION CHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20060505), vol. 35, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S10953-005-9010-0, ISSN 1572-8927, pages 551 - 566, XP019401806 [A] 1,13 * abstract * * page 558, line 11 - page 560, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10953-005-9010-0 | [A] - XIAO-HUA LU, MAURER G, "Model for describing activity coefficients in mixed electrolyte aqueous solutions", AICHE JOURNAL, WILEY, (199309), vol. 39, no. 9, pages 1527 - 1538, XP002633918 [A] 1,6,13 * abstract * * page 1528, column 2, paragraph l - page 1530, column 1, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/aic.690390912 | [A] - LIN CHENG-LONG; LEE LIANG-SUN, "A two-ionic-parameter approach for ion activity coefficients of aqueous electrolyte solutions", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, ELSEVIER, ELSEVIER, (20030315), vol. 205, no. 1, pages 69 - 88, XP002633919 [A] 1,13 * abstract * * page 73, paragraph l - page 74, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-3812(02)00275-3 | [A] - PAPAICONOMOU N ET AL, "MSA-NRTL model for the description of the thermodynamic properties of electrolyte solutions", PHYSICAL CHEMISTRY CHEMICAL PHYSICS, RCS PUBLISHING, (2002), vol. 4, pages 4435 - 4443, XP002633920 [A] 1,13 * abstract * * page 4438, column 1, line 7 - page 4439, column 1, line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B204841H | [A] - ABBAS ET AL, "From restricted towards realistic models of salt solutions: Corrected Debye-Huckel theory and Monte Carlo simulations", FLUID PHASE EQUILIBRIA, ELSEVIER, (20071012), vol. 260, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.FLUID.2007.07.026, ISSN 0378-3812, pages 233 - 247, XP022296252 [A] 1,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fluid.2007.07.026 | International search | [A]SE383567 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]US5112949 (VUKOVICH THOMAS [AT]); | [A]WO9731692 (PHARMACIA BIOTECH AB [SE], et al); | [A]US2005082228 (DE LAMOTTE FREDERIC [FR]) |