EP2268133 - KIT FOR GROWING SHELLFISH, ASSEMBLY OF PARTS OF SUCH A KIT AND METHOD FOR GROWING SHELLFISH USING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/01] | METHOD AND KIT FOR GROWING SHELLFISH | ||
[2016/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2015/17] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast- Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OORSCHOT, Ronald Willem Arie Olmenstraat 6 NL-4462 BG Goes / NL | 02 /
DE VOS, Ronald Berkenstraat 108 NL-4388 LN Oost-Souburg / NL | [2011/01] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/15] |
Former [2011/01] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09734318.0 | 24.04.2009 | [2011/01] | WO2009NL50222 | Priority number, date | EP20080155229 | 25.04.2008 Original published format: EP 08155229 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009131455 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2268133 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2268133 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00 | [2011/01] | CPC: |
A01K61/54 (EP);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2011/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZÜCHTUNG VON SCHALENTIEREN, BAUSATZ FÜR EINE SOLCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZÜCHTUNG VON SCHALENTIEREN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2016/47] | English: | KIT FOR GROWING SHELLFISH, ASSEMBLY OF PARTS OF SUCH A KIT AND METHOD FOR GROWING SHELLFISH USING SUCH AN ASSEMBLY | [2016/47] | French: | KIT POUR LA CULTURE DE MOLLUSQUES ET CRUSTACÉS, AGENCEMENT DES PIÈCES D'UN TEL KIT ET MÉTHODE POUR LA CULTURE DE MOLLUSQUES ET CRUSTACÉS UTILISANT UN TEL AGENCEMENT | [2016/47] |
Former [2011/01] | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUR ZÜCHTUNG VON KRUSTENTIEREN | ||
Former [2011/01] | METHOD AND KIT FOR GROWING SHELLFISH | ||
Former [2011/01] | PROCÉDÉ ET KIT POUR ÉLEVER DES CRUSTACÉS OU DES MOLLUSQUES | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2010 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 12.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2009 | AT | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | IT | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | IE | 24.04.2017 | LU | 24.04.2017 | MT | 24.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 24.04.2009 | |
AT | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
MT | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 24.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 24.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR2484197 (LECOVEOUR FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-4,9-11 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 29 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,5 * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]FR2420305 (ANVAR [FR]) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, lines 36-40 * * page 2, lines 21-27 * * page 4, lines 6-10 * * figure 4 *; | [Y]FR2525862 (LECLANCHE SOLANGE [FR]) [Y] 1-13,15,16 * page 1, line 10 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, lines 31-37 * * page 3, lines 25-38 * * page 6, lines 19-30 * * figure 5; claims 1,2,5 *; | [A]US4182270 (FOURCHER FREDERICK J [US]) [A] 6,7,11,12 * figure 1 * | [Y] - A. SÁNCHEZ-MATA AND J. MORA, "A review of marine aquaculture in Spain: production, regulations and environmental monitoring", J. APPL. ICHTHYOL., Blackwell Wissenschafts-Verlag, Berlin, (2000), vol. 16, pages 209 - 213, XP002495162 [Y] 1-13,15,16 * page 1, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1439-0426.2000.00261.x |