EP2193382 - PLUNGER WITH A QUICK LOCKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Multitest elektronische Systeme GmbH Äussere Oberaustr. 4 83026 Rosenheim / DE | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURNAUER, Simon Oberrain 13 83104 Tuntenhausen / DE | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09734358.6 | 09.04.2009 | [2010/23] | WO2009EP02658 | Priority number, date | DE20081020585 | 24.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008020585 | [2010/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009129935 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2193382 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2193382 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/28 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
G01R31/2893 (EP,US);
G01R31/2808 (EP,US);
G01R31/2867 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4913 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53174 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53178 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/23] | Title | German: | PLUNGER MIT SCHNELLVERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/23] | English: | PLUNGER WITH A QUICK LOCKING SYSTEM | [2010/23] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PLONGEUR À SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE RAPIDE | [2010/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.03.2011 | CZ | 23.03.2011 | DK | 23.03.2011 | EE | 23.03.2011 | FI | 23.03.2011 | HR | 23.03.2011 | HU | 23.03.2011 | IE | 23.03.2011 | IT | 23.03.2011 | LT | 23.03.2011 | LV | 23.03.2011 | MK | 23.03.2011 | NL | 23.03.2011 | PL | 23.03.2011 | RO | 23.03.2011 | SE | 23.03.2011 | SI | 23.03.2011 | SK | 23.03.2011 | TR | 23.03.2011 | LU | 09.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | BG | 23.06.2011 | NO | 23.06.2011 | GR | 24.06.2011 | ES | 04.07.2011 | IS | 23.07.2011 | PT | 25.07.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
TR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 09.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
LU | 09.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
MK | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
IT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
DK | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
IE | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
PL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
NL | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
IS | 23.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
CZ | 23.03.2011 | ||
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
RO | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
SK | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
ES | 04.07.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
EE | 23.03.2011 | ||
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
PT | 25.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.03.2011 | |
FI | 23.03.2011 | ||
HR | 23.03.2011 | ||
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
SI | 23.03.2011 | ||
BG | 23.06.2011 | ||
NO | 23.06.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 23.03.2011 | |
LT | 23.03.2011 | ||
LV | 23.03.2011 | ||
SE | 23.03.2011 | ||
GR | 24.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5523678 (MITSUI OSAMU [JP]) [X] 1-9* the whole document * |